Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50946
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Feb 26, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.
2900 Black Lake Place
Philadelphia, PA 19154
Represented By
Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Friday, February 26, 2021
19 19 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 02/26 10:04 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/26 2:05 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50946 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/04 4:46 PM
Certificate of Service re: Certification of Counsel with Respect to Order Approving Third Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint [Docket No. 15] and Order Approving Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint [Docket No. 16] Related [+] Filed by Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-] 15 ,16
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/04 4:38 PM
Certificate of Service re: Certification of Counsel with Respect to Order Approving Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint [Docket No. 11] and Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint [Docket No. 13] Related [+] Filed by Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-] 11 ,13
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/03 9:36 AM
ORDER APPROVING THIRD STIPULATION EXTENDINGTIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 2/3/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
15 15 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 02/02 3:48 PM
Certification of Counsel with Respect to Order Approving Third Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:03 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 10 ,12
13 13 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/30 11:26 AM
ORDER APPROVING SECOND STIPULATION EXTENDINGTIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Signed on 12/30/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
11 11 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 12/29 5:17 PM
Certification of Counsel with Respect to Order Approving Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:14 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
8 8 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Fri 12/18 2:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/08 12:31 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAIN Related [+] Order Signed on 12/8/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 12/08 10:52 AM
Certification of Counsel with Respect to Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.. (Maddox, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:19 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:18 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50946 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 2:44 PM
Adversary case 20-50946 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Sautter Crane Rental, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives