Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50951
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tract Resources, LLC
1125 N. Military Avenue
Green Bay, WI 54303
Represented By
Tract Resources, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, April 15, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/15 8:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50951 Closed (BJM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/01 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Fri 09/30 10:58 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
21 21 order Judgment Wed 09/28 4:04 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Consent Judgment and Entry of Order for Judgment Related [+] Tickle due by: 10/12/2022. Signed on 9/28/2022. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 20
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, September 01, 2022
20 20 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 09/01 11:20 AM
Joint Certification of Counsel Requesting Approval of Stipulation for Consent Judgment and Entry of Order for Judgment Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, March 21, 2022
19 19 court Case Reassigned Mon 03/21 1:11 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/15 9:31 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, November 11, 2021
17 17 misc Status Report Thu 11/11 5:43 PM
Status Report Regarding the Court's Order at Docket No. 16 Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
16 16 notice VAN-417 Notice and Order of Request for Status Report Wed 10/20 9:59 AM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 11/10/2021. Signed on 10/20/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:38 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:05 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 12 ,13
13 13 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
12 12 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:18 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
10 10 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
9 9 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 12/09 12:13 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Peter T. Nowa Related [+] Order Signed on 12/9/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 12/09 12:13 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Paul G. Swanso Related [+] Order Signed on 12/9/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 12/09 11:58 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Peter T. Nowak of Steinhilber Swanson LLP . Receipt Number 3385729, Filed by Tract Resources, LLC. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 12/09 11:57 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Paul G. Swanson of Steinhilber Swanson LLP . Receipt Number 3385729, Filed by Tract Resources, LLC. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/09 11:55 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Tract Resources, LLC Mediation due date: 04/8/2021. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:30 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Tract Resources, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:30 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50951 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 3:03 PM
Adversary case 20-50951 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Tract Resources, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives