Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50954
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Jun 17, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
US Crossings Unlimited, LLC
20436 Route 19, #620-244
Cranberry Township, PA 16066
Represented By
US Crossings Unlimited, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, June 17, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/17 3:25 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50954 Closed (SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
39 39 mediation Mediation Status Report Thu 06/16 9:20 AM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
38 38 court Mediator Report Past Due Wed 06/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/15 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/15 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33
35 35 mediation Mediation Status Report Thu 04/14 11:18 AM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
34 34 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Tue 04/12 1:40 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant US Crossings Unlimited, LLC. Related [+] Tickle due by: 4/26/2022. Signed on 4/12/2022. (BJM)
Related: [-] 31
33 33 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/12 1:37 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant US Crossings Unlimited, LLC. Related [+] Signed on 4/12/2022. (BJM)
Related: [-] 30
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/12 9:35 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 30 ,31
31 31 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Tue 04/12 9:34 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment // Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 30 30
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
30 30 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Tue 04/12 9:30 AM
Request for Entry of Default // Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Requesting Clerk's Entry of Default
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Monday, March 21, 2022
29 29 court Case Reassigned Mon 03/21 1:11 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
28 28 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Tue 03/08 5:10 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 3/9/2022 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/08 12:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF COOCH AND TAYLOR, P.A. ANDJOHN D. EDDY, ESQUIRE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSELFOR DEFENDANT US CROSSING UNLIMITED, LLCAND REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO RETAIN SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL Related [+] Order Signed on 3/8/2022. (CAS)
Related: [-] 26
Monday, March 07, 2022
26 26 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Mon 03/07 9:45 AM
Certification of Counsel of MOTION OF COOCH AND TAYLOR, P.A. AND JOHN D. EDDY, ESQUIRE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT US CROSSING UNLIMITED, LLC Related [+] Filed by US Crossings Unlimited, LLC. (Pedigo, Robert)
Related: [-] 25
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Friday, February 18, 2022
25 25 motion Withdraw As Attorney - Motion Fri 02/18 12:28 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by US Crossings Unlimited, LLC. Objections due by 3/5/2022. (Pedigo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Notice
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
24 24 mediation Mediation Status Report Wed 02/16 4:12 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
23 23 mediation Mediation Status Report Thu 12/16 2:21 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
22 22 court Mediator Report Past Due Wed 12/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 10, 2021
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/11 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Friday, October 08, 2021
20 20 court VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation Fri 10/08 2:05 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 12/8/2021. Signed on 10/8/2021. (SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
19 19 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Thu 10/07 6:49 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and US Crossings Unlimited, LLC . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/27 3:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by US Crossings Unlimited, LLC Mediation due date: 09/24/2021.(Pedigo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Invoice
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Tue 05/18 8:35 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Video Only Hearing on May 18, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (ET) Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 05/13 5:33 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 5/18/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/29 9:09 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 4/29/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 04/28 4:11 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
13 13 cmp Alias Summons Wed 03/31 12:04 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant US Crossings Unlimited, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 6/1/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, March 01, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:39 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:07 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:20 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
7 7 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/02 12:16 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
5 5 cmp Alias Summons Wed 12/02 12:14 PM
Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant US Crossings Unlimited, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/1/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:42 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant US Crossings Unlimited, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:41 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50954 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 3:14 PM
Adversary case 20-50954 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against US Crossings Unlimited, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives