Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50955
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Feb 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Veriforce, LLC
1575 Sawdust Road Suite 600
The Woodlands, TX 77380
Represented By
Veriforce, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, February 18, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/18 9:33 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50955 Closed (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
36 36 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/17 4:54 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
35 35 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/11 8:53 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TODEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Related [+] Order Signed on 2/11/2022. (CAS)
Related: [-] 34
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
34 34 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 02/09 7:14 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Bibiloni, Jose)
Related: [-] 32 ,33
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
33 33 misc Brief Wed 01/26 12:30 PM
Opening Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] Filed by Veriforce, LLC. (McMillan, James)
Related: [-] 32
Att: 1 Affidavit Unsworn Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
32 32 motion Summary Judgment(Adv) - Motion Wed 01/26 12:23 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] Filed by Veriforce, LLC. (McMillan, James)
Related: [-] 1 1
Friday, December 17, 2021
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/17 3:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Veriforce, LLC Mediation due date: 04/18/2022.(McMillan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 18, 2021
30 30 order Reopen Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/18 12:17 PM
Order Approving Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding, to Set Aside the Clerk's Default and Vacate the Default Judgment Related [+] Order Signed on 11/18/2021. (DRG)
Related: [-] 18
utility Reopen AP Case Thu 11/18 12:19 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. (SJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
29 29 motion Request for Oral Argument Wed 11/17 2:41 PM
Request for Oral Argument Filed by Veriforce, LLC Related [+]. (McMillan, James)
Related: [-] 18
28 28 notice Withdrawal - Notice Wed 11/17 2:38 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant's Request for Oral Argument Related [+] Filed by Veriforce, LLC (McMillan, James)
Related: [-] 27
27 27 motion Request for Oral Argument Wed 11/17 2:26 PM
(WITHDRAWN ON 11/17/21 SEE DOCKET NO. 28) Request for Oral Argument Filed by Veriforce, LLC Related [+]. (McMillan, James) Modified on 11/18/2021 (DRG)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, November 15, 2021
26 26 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/15 10:39 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Henry A. Kin Related [+] Order Signed on 11/15/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 19
25 25 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/15 10:37 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Robert J. Burvan Related [+] Order Signed on 11/15/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 20
24 24 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 11/15 10:36 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice W. Spencer Kin Related [+] Order Signed on 11/15/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, November 12, 2021
23 23 misc Brief Fri 11/12 2:50 PM
Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding, Vacate Default Judgment, and Memorandum in Support Related [+] Filed by Veriforce, LLC. (McMillan, James)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, November 05, 2021
22 22 answer Objection Fri 11/05 5:57 PM
Objection // Plaintiff's Objection and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Veriforce, LLC's Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding, Vacate Default Judgment, and Memorandum in Support Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 18
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 10/26 4:07 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Receipt Number 3610535, Filed by Veriforce, LLC. (McMillan, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 10/26 4:05 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Receipt Number 3610535, Filed by Veriforce, LLC. (McMillan, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 10/26 4:04 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Receipt Number 3610535, Filed by Veriforce, LLC. (McMillan, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
18 18 motion Reopen Adversary Proceeding - Motion Fri 10/22 5:50 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding , Vacate Default Judgment, and Memorandum in Support . Filed by Veriforce, LLC. (McMillan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Unsworn Declaration in Support of Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding, Vacate Default Judgment, and Memorandum in Support
Friday, April 09, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/09 8:53 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50955 Closed (FMo)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 27, 2021
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/28 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/28 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, March 25, 2021
15 15 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Thu 03/25 12:18 PM
Default Judgment against Defendant Veriforce, LLC. Related [+]. Signed on 3/25/2021. (FMo)
Related: [-] 12
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 03/25 9:49 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Veriforce, LLC Related [+] Signed on 3/25/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/24 3:38 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 11 ,12
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Wed 03/24 3:37 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment // Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
11 11 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Wed 03/24 3:35 PM
Request for Entry of Default // Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Declaration Requesting Clerk's Entry of Default)
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Monday, March 01, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:40 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:07 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 7 ,8
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
7 7 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:21 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
5 5 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:44 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Veriforce, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:43 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50955 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 3:17 PM
Adversary case 20-50955 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Veriforce, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives