Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50956
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Apr 08, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company
500 North Third Street P.O. Box 1299
Steubenville, OH 43952
Represented By
The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Thursday, April 08, 2021
18 18 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 04/08 12:18 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/08 3:10 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50956 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Service Tue 03/02 10:56 AM
Notice of Service of Voto's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Filed by The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company (Pedigo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
16 16 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:40 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
15 15 motion Stipulation Wed 02/17 10:56 AM
Stipulation Third Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Between The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company and Plaintiff . Filed by The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company. (Pedigo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Order
Thursday, January 14, 2021
14 14 3 pgs order Order Thu 01/14 10:18 AM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTTHE VOTO MANUFACTURERS SALES COMPANY FOR SECOND EXTENSION OFTIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Related [+] Order Signed on 1/14/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
13 13 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 01/13 4:39 PM
Certification of Counsel of Joint stipulation for a Second Extension for Voto to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company. (Pedigo, Robert)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Form of Order
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:08 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 10 ,11
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
10 10 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:22 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
8 8 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
7 7 3 pgs order Order Wed 12/16 9:16 AM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PLAINTIFF ANDDEFENDANT THE VOTO MANUFACTURERS SALES COMPANY FOR EXTENSIONOF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS FILED IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS Related [+] Order Signed on 12/16/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 12/15 4:04 PM
Certification of Counsel REQUESTING ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT THE VOTO MANUFACTURERS SALES COMPANY FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Filed by The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company. (Pedigo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Form of Order
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Tue 12/08 12:02 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company (Pedigo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:45 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:44 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50956 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 3:22 PM
Adversary case 20-50956 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against The Voto Manufacturers Sales Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives