Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50959
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Oct 13, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Williams Scotsman, Inc.
901 South Bond Street
Baltimore, MD 21231
Represented By
Williams Scotsman, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/13 11:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50959 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/12 4:18 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
32 32 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Wed 09/29 10:27 AM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
31 31 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 09/07 2:59 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
30 30 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/13 9:45 AM
ORDER APPROVING FOURTH STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR COUNTER-DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COUNTERCLAIM Related [+] Order Signed on 8/13/2021. (DRG)
Related: [-] 1 ,29
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, August 12, 2021
29 29 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 08/12 5:22 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Fourth Extension of Time for Counter-Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Sunday, July 11, 2021
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/12 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/11/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27
Friday, July 09, 2021
27 27 court VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation Fri 07/09 10:25 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 9/7/2021. Signed on 7/9/2021. (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order Fri 07/09 8:52 AM
ORDER APPROVING THIRD STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR COUNTER-DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COUNTERCLAIM Related [+] Order Signed on 7/9/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 25
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, July 08, 2021
25 25 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 07/08 5:04 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Third Extension of Time for Counter-Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
24 24 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Thu 07/08 5:02 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Williams Scotsman, Inc. . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
23 23 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/06 12:51 PM
ORDER APPROVING SECOND STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR COUNTER-DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COUNTERCLAIM Related [+] Order Signed on 5/6/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
22 22 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 05/06 9:49 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Second Extension of Time for Counter-Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 09, 2021
21 21 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/09 6:45 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR COUNTER-DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COUNTERCLAIM Related [+] Order Signed on 4/9/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 20
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, April 08, 2021
20 20 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 04/08 12:27 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Counter-Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
19 19 notice Notice of Service Tue 03/30 10:55 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Williams Scotsman, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
18 18 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Wed 03/10 10:47 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim by Williams Scotsman, Inc. against Welded Construction, L.P. Filed by Williams Scotsman, Inc. Mediation due date: 07/8/2021.(Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 01, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 10:27 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures and First Set of Discovery Requests Directed to Plaintiff Filed by Williams Scotsman, Inc. (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:42 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/10 12:24 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 2/10/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 02/10 11:08 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,6 ,13
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 28, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 01/28 3:07 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAIN Related [+] Order Signed on 1/28/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 12
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
12 12 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 01/28 12:10 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:10 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:26 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
7 7 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/07 11:24 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 12/7/2020. (DRG)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, December 03, 2020
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 12/03 6:15 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:50 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Williams Scotsman, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:49 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50959 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 3:33 PM
Adversary case 20-50959 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Williams Scotsman, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives