Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12378

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50960
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2020
Terminated:Jan 03, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Worldwide Machinery, Inc.
2200 Post Oak Boulevard Suite 1400
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Worldwide Machinery, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Welded Construction, L.P.
P.O. Box 470
Perrysburg, OH 43551
Represented By
Josef W. Mintz
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, January 03, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/03 1:05 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50960 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
28 28 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/30 10:33 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
27 27 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Mon 12/13 12:36 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
26 26 court Mediator Report Past Due Mon 11/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
25 25 mediation Mediation Status Report Thu 09/16 12:14 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
24 24 court Mediator Report Past Due Wed 09/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 30, 2021
23 23 notice Notice of Service Mon 08/30 2:07 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Worldwide Machinery, Inc. dba Worldwide Rental Services' Second Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 05, 2021
22 22 notice Notice of Service Thu 08/05 4:40 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Worldwide Machinery, Inc. dba Worldwide Rental Services' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Request for Admission Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
21 21 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 07/13 12:38 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 15, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/16 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Thursday, May 13, 2021
19 19 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Thu 05/13 8:11 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Bifferato, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 7/13/2021. Signed on 5/13/2021. (DMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
18 18 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Wed 05/12 11:23 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between Welded Construction, L.P. and Worldwide Machinery, Inc. dba Worldwide Rental Services . Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/03 9:45 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TORESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Order Signed on 5/3/2021. (CAS)
Related: [-] 16
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, April 29, 2021
16 16 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 04/29 6:33 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 29, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/29 6:48 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Order Signed on 3/29/2021. (CAS) Modified on 3/30/2021 (CAS)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Mon 03/29 4:53 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 01, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Service Mon 03/01 1:43 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Welded Construction, L.P. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/11 6:30 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Worldwide Machinery, Inc. Mediation due date: 05/11/2021.(Hurford, Mark)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service with service list
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/30 1:10 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 12/30 9:37 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/29 12:27 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 12/29/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 12/29 10:32 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
7 7 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 12/23 12:10 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // Notice of Rescheduled Pretrial Conference Hearing Originally Scheduled for January 7, 2021 has been rescheduled. Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/07 1:12 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT Related [+] Order Signed on 12/7/2020. (DRG)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Mon 12/07 10:18 AM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
4 4 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 11/11 1:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Worldwide Machinery, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/11/2021. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] ument1 ,3
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 11/11 1:50 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Welded Construction, L.P.. (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/20 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50960 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10011666, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 10/20 3:36 PM
Adversary case 20-50960 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Welded Construction, L.P. against Worldwide Machinery, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Mintz, Josef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives