Boyle et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-03847 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday May 02, 2021 5:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Marcus Darrell Boyle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kinsey Anne Boyle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/19 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Kinsey Anne BoyleAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03847-RMG(Feliciani, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Thu 01/07 12:18 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporations General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/11 7:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Liat Rome on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Rome, Jacqueline) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 11/04 11:03 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Boyle et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-3847-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/04 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/04 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9450235.), filed by Kinsey Anne Boyle, Marcus Darrell Boyle. Service due by 2/1/2021(sshe, ) |