Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sue E Myerscough
Referred: Eric I Long
Case #: 3:20-cv-03300
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2020
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 08, 2021 4:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Illinois State Board of Education
Represented By
Taylor Rose Reynolds Traynoff
Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Doug Hubbard
Represented By
John A Baker
Baker Baker & Krajewski LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/20 9:06 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/19/2025: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal40 filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). For the reasons stated therein, the case is dismissed with prejudice and without leave to reinstate. Each party is to bear their own attorney's fees, costs, and expenses. The Clerk is directed to terminate the case.(JS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/18 11:54 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Illinois State Board of Education. (Bautista, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 01/07 7:09 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/26/2025 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (LN)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/07 12:02 AM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 12/04 2:16 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 12/4/2024: Settlement conference held on 12/4/2024. Settlement reached. Parties to exchange settlement drafts. A telephone conference is set on 2/26/2025 at 10:00 a.m. The Court will place the call. If a stipulation to dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)A)(ii) is filed before 2/19/3025, the status conference will be canceled. (JS)
Related: [-]
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 12/05 12:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Settlement Conference held on 12/4/2024. Plaintiff Doug Hubbard present with counsel of record John A. Baker. AAG Laura Bautista present on behalf of Defendant. Mediation conducted among the parties. Mediation successful. Parties discussed material terms on the record. Record is to be sealed. Parties to file a stipulation to dismiss pursuant to final settlement agreement. (Tape #SP-C 9:32 AM.) (GL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
minutes Status Conference - Referral Judge Fri 10/25 9:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Status Conference held 10/25/2024 via telephone. Attorney John A. Baker present on behalf of Plaintiff. AAG Laura K. Bautista present on behalf of Defendant. Order to enter. Hearing adjourned. (GL)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 10/25 10:16 AM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 10/25/2024: The parties have jointly requested a settlement conference, which will be held in person on 12/4/2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom III before Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught. Counsel are to have a representative with full settlement authority physically present at the settlement conference or immediately available. The parties are to submit directly to chambers a settlement statement (form provided at https://www.ilcd.uscourts.gov/forms/local forms/all-forms under the Springfield heading/settlement statement form) stating their position regarding settlement 5 business days prior to the settlement conference. DO NOT FILE THIS STATEMENT WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE OR EXCHANGE IT WITH OPPOSING PARTIES. Parties have leave of court to email the statement directly to chambers at karen_mcnaught@ilcd.uscourts.gov or mail the statement addressed to: Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught, 124 U.S. Courthouse, 600 East Monroe Street, Springfield, IL 62701.(GL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/18 2:06 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 10/18/2024: The telephone status conference set on 10/23/2024 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss whether a settlement conference could resolve this case is re-set on 10/25/2024 at 9:30 a.m. The Court will place the call. (JS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
order Order Thu 10/10 3:37 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. District Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/10/2024. Defendant has filed a proposed Consent to Magistrate Judge (d/e39 ). If Plaintiff agrees to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, he should also sign the proposed Consent to Magistrate Judge and file the executed copy of record for the Court's consideration. (JS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
39 39 misc Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 10/09 11:08 AM
PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Bautista, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
minutes Status Conference - Referral Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/18 9:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Status Conference held 9/17/2024 via telephone. Attorney John A. Baker present on behalf of Plaintiff. AAG Laura K. Bautista present on behalf of Defendant. Telephonic status conference set 10/23/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught. (Court will place the call.) Parties are to be prepared to advise the Court if a Settlement Conference is needed. Hearing adjourned. (GL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/09 9:14 AM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 9/9/2024: Plaintiff's motion to reschedule the status38 is GRANTED for the reason set forth therein. The telephone status conference is re-set to time only on 9/17/2024 at 2:30 p.m. The Court will place the call. (ED)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
38 38 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/06 11:42 AM
MOTION re Order, Set/Reset Hearings Motion to Reset status conference by Plaintiff Doug Hubbard. Responses due by 9/20/2024 (Baker, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/04 2:35 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 9/4/2024: A telephone status conference is set on 9/17/2024 at 10:30 a.m. to discuss trial dates and whether a settlement conference could resolve this case. The Court will place the call. (JS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 07/18 8:59 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 7/18/2024: Defendant Illinois State Board of Education's Motion to Substitute Counsel36 is ALLOWED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Lisa Cook as defendant's counsel.(JS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 07/17 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Laura K Bautista on behalf of Illinois State Board of Education (Bautista, Laura)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 07/17 5:01 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Lisa Cook to be replaced by Laura K. Bautista, by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 7/31/2024 (Bautista, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
35 35 22 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 06/27 2:38 PM
OPINION AND ORDER entered by Judge Sue E Myerscough on 6/27/24. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment18 and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment16 are each DENIED. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER. (FDS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
order Order on Motion to Supplement Tue 04/18 3:07 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: Plaintiff's motion to supplement his motion for summary judgment with an appendix20 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's appendix has been filed21 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 4/18/2023. (GL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
34 34 motion Vacate Tue 01/31 11:46 AM
Joint MOTION to Vacate Order,,, Set/Reset Hearings,, by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 2/14/2023 (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Vacate 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/31 4:20 PM
TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Deadlines. See d/e34 . For the reasons stated therein, the motion is GRANTED. The final pretrial conference and jury trial settings in this matter are hereby VACATED. They shall be reset after the Court has disposed of the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 1/31/2023. (GL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
33 33 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Mon 12/12 1:30 PM
ORDER: The motion to withdraw admissions28 is ALLOWED. Defendant is permitted to withdraw the admissions in paragraphs 1 through 12 of defendant's response to plaintiff's request for admissions. If plaintiff needs additional discovery due to this order, plaintiff should file a motion seeking additional time within 14 days. If plaintiff seeks additional time, discovery will be reopened for plaintiff only. If plaintiff needs to file an amended motion for summary judgment or response to defendants motion for summary judgment, plaintiff should file a motion explaining how much additional time is needed. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER.) Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 12/12/2022. (GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 12/01 6:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Doug Hubbard. (Baker, John)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response to Motion/Petition Thu 12/01 4:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re28 MOTION to Withdraw Admissions filed by Plaintiff Doug Hubbard. (Baker, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/22 3:53 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: Defendant's Third Motion for Extension of Time27 is DENIED as MOOT. The defendant filed his response29 on 11/18/2022 and his reply30 on 11/18/2022. Entered on 11/22/2022. (DM)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/18 11:27 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response to Motion/Petition Fri 11/18 11:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Withdraw Fri 11/18 11:13 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Admissions by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 12/2/2022 (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/08 9:14 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,23 Response to Motion,16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 11/22/2022 (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/27 9:08 AM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time26 is ALLOWED. The parties have until and including 11/8/2022 to file a response to plaintiff's partial motion for summary judgement and a reply is support of defendant's motion for summary judgement. Entered on 10/27/2022. (ME)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/25 4:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,23 Response to Motion,19 Memorandum by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 11/8/2022 (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 10/25 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa A Cook on behalf of Illinois State Board of Education (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 10/25 11:03 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Taylor Traynoff to be replaced by Lisa Cook, by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 11/8/2022 (Cook, Lisa)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 10/25 1:53 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: Defendant's Motion to Substitute Counsel24 is ALLOWED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Taylor Traynoff as defendant's counsel. Entered on 10/25/2022. (ME)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
23 23 respm Response to Motion/Petition Tue 10/11 5:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Doug Hubbard.(Baker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/11 3:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 10/25/2022 (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 10/11 3:52 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion22 is ALLOWED. Defendant must file dispositive motions by 10/25/2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 10/11/2022. (GL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/28 4:11 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 9/28/2022. In light of the Court's schedule and the summary judgment motions recently filed in this matter, the final pretrial conference and jury trial settings are hereby CONTINUED. The final pretrial conference currently set for October 3, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. is CONTINUED to February 6, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom I in Springfield before U.S. District Judge Sue E. Myerscough. The jury trial currently set for October 18, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. is CONTINUED to February 21, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom I before Judge Myerscough.(BMG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
21 21 misc Exhibit Wed 09/21 3:08 PM
Exhibit re19 Memorandum by Doug Hubbard.(Baker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix Part 1,
Att: 2 Appendix Appendix Part 2,
Att: 3 Appendix Appendix Part 3,
Att: 4 Appendix Appendix Part 4
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
20 20 motion Supplement Tue 09/20 7:20 PM
MOTION to Supplement to file appendix to memo on September 21, 2022 by Plaintiff Doug Hubbard. Responses due by 10/4/2022 (Baker, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 30+ pgs misc Memorandum Tue 09/20 7:15 PM
MEMORANDUM re18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Doug Hubbard. (Baker, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Tue 09/20 6:31 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Doug Hubbard. Responses due by 10/11/2022 (Baker, John)
Related: [-]
17 17 13 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 09/20 6:03 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Illinois State Board of Education.(Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Tue 09/20 5:59 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 10/11/2022 (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 08/05 12:44 PM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: The unopposed fourth motion for extension of time to file dispositive motions15 is ALLOWED. Dispositive motions are due by September 20, 2022. Further extensions will not be allowed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 8/5/2022. (GL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 08/01 3:32 PM
Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion Deadline by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 8/15/2022 (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 07/25 9:04 AM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: The unopposed motion for extension of time to file dispositive motions14 is ALLOWED. Dispositive motions are due by August 1, 2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 7/25/2022. (GL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 06/27 2:37 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 7/11/2022 (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 06/08 11:30 AM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: Motion for extension of time12 is DENIED as moot. The dispositive motion deadline was extended on June 1, 2022. Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 6/8/2022. (GL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/01 9:47 AM
TEXT ORDER: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file dispositive motions13 is GRANTED. The dispositive motions deadline in this action is hereby CONTINUED to June 27, 2022. In light of this continuance, the Final Pretrial Conference previously set for June 6, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., is hereby CONTINUED to October 3, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. before District Judge Sue Myerscough. The Jury Trial previously set for June 21, 2022, at 9:00 a.m., is hereby CONTINUED to October 18, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. before District Judge Sue Myerscough. Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 6/1/2022. (MJC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 05/17 4:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 5/31/2022 (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/14 2:53 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion and Extend Deadline by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 4/28/2022 (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
order Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge McNaught Mon 04/11 4:48 PM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on April 11, 2022. Due to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught for further proceedings. (LN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/15 10:27 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. This case is set for telephone status conference on 3/16/2022 to discuss whether the parties are jointly interested in setting the matter for mediation. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins on 3/23/2022, this telephonic conference is CANCELLED. Parties to file motion to schedule mediation before the U.S. Magistrate Judge if the parties agree that mediation might help resolve the case. (LB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ~Util - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 12/16 10:29 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order11 is ALLOWED. Fact discovery deadline is extended to 3/15/2022; Dispositive motions deadline is extended to 4/14/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set 1/11/2022 is CANCELLED and reset Wednesday, 3/16/2022, at 9:30 a.m. (Court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. Final pretrial and trial dates remain as previously scheduled. (LB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
11 11 motion Amend/Correct Wed 12/15 4:42 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order (Unopposed) by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 12/29/2021 (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 12/07 9:10 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, telephonic Status Conference set 12/15/2021 is CANCELLED and reset Tuesday, 1/11/2022, at 9:30 AM (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. (LB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
order Order Tue 03/16 8:43 AM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Request to Admit10 is STRICKEN. Parties must not file discovery responses until they are used in the proceeding or the Court orders filing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(A). Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 3/16/2021. (GL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
10 10 misc Response (NOT to a motion/petition) Fri 03/12 11:52 AM
Response by Illinois State Board of Education To Plaintiff's Request To Admit . (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/25 2:59 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. TIME LIMITS AND SETTINGS ARE ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Initial Disclosures due by 3/1/2021; Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2021; Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2021; All Discovery due by 12/15/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set 6/6/2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 in Springfield before U.S. District Judge Sue E. Myerscough. Jury Trial set 6/21/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge Myerscough. Telephonic Status Conference set Wednesday, 12/15/2021, at 10:00 AM (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. See written order. (LB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Memo,
Att: 2 Courtroom Technology Brochure
8 8 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Thu 02/25 10:47 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2021 with Attorneys John Baker and Taylor Traynoff. Written Scheduling Order to follow. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge. See attached form. (LB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Form
Friday, January 29, 2021
7 7 misc Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 01/29 11:51 AM
DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Doug Hubbard. (Baker, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/27 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 2/25/2021, at 9:30 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 2/23/2021. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(F) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/25 4:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Illinois State Board of Education.(Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/15 8:49 AM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time5 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 1/25/2021 for Defendant to answer or otherwise plead. (LB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/11 2:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Illinois State Board of Education. Responses due by 1/25/2021 (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 11/25 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Taylor Rose Reynolds Traynoff on behalf of Illinois State Board of Education (Traynoff, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 11, 2020
3 3 service Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit Wed 11/11 2:07 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Illinois State Board of Education on 11/11/2020.(Baker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, November 09, 2020
2 2 misc Certificate of Interest Mon 11/09 1:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Doug Hubbard. (Baker, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Mon 11/09 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Illinois State Board of Education ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3518027.), filed by Doug Hubbard.(Baker, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet