David L. Burg v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:20-cv-82053 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:20-cv-09469 |
Last checked: Sunday May 09, 2021 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Institutional LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nostrum Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Novitium Pharma LLC
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Research & Development Company
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ranbaxy Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC
55 Corporate Drive
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 |
|
Defendant
Strides Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc. f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Torrent Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt USA LLC
|
|
Defendant
Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
L. Perrigo Co.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
1 through 10 251 174th Street
Miami Beach, FL 33160 |
|
Defendant
ANDA Repository LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ajanta Pharma USA Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Granules USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Heritage Pharma Labs Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
David L. Burg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 04/02 11:57 AM
Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David L. Burg.(Mackey, Scott) |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Mon 03/15 4:24 PM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., Inc Pfizer, Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, ANDA Repository LLC, Apotex Corporation, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Granules USA, Inc., Heritage Pharma Labs Inc., Heritage Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., L. Perrigo Co., Mylan Institutional LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., Nostrum Laboratories Inc., Novitium Pharma LLC, Perrigo Company, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Ranbaxy Inc., Sandoz Inc., Strides Pharma Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc. f/k/a Ranbaxy Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Torrent Pharma Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem Inc., McKesson Corporation, Ajanta Pharma USA Inc., Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp., Granules USA, Inc., Wockhardt USA Inc., filed by David L. Burg.(Mackey, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Fri 03/12 9:46 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re18 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal. Parties Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (jas) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Thu 03/11 7:38 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy Inc., filed by David L. Burg.(Mackey, Scott) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Fri 01/08 5:59 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re16 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal. Parties Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (jas) |
|
16 | 16
6
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 01/08 12:35 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy Inc., filed by David L. Burg.(Mackey, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
8
pgs
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Tue 12/15 1:27 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against CVS Pharmacy Inc., filed by David L. Burg.(Mackey, Scott) |
|
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Administrative Order
Fri 11/20 3:41 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Tue 11/10 2:10 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 2:20-cv-09469 with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-82053-RLR on 11/10/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
12 | 12
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 11/10 12:24 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Tue 11/10 12:22 PM
Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-09469. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Wednesday, November 04, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 Conditional Transfer Order - 40 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) | |
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) | |
8 | 8 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 30, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before November 9, 2020. (iv) | |
7 | 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY | |
Friday, October 16, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) | |
Thursday, October 15, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant CVS Health Corporation. (Johnston, Sarah) | |
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CVS Health Corporation, identifying CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Johnston, Sarah) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CVS Health Corporation. (Johnston, Sarah) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV35648 Receipt No: ACACDC-28558684 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CVS Health Corporation. (Attorney Sarah E Johnston added to party CVS Health Corporation(pty:dft))(Johnston, Sarah) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action | ||
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff David L. Burg. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/17/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |