Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:18-bk-34105

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:20-ap-03172
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2020
Terminated:May 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
SCRIPPS Media, Inc.
Plaintiff
James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Michael W. Sebesta
Cavazos Hendricks Poirot, P,c.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
court Close adversary case Tue 05/04 2:40 PM
Adversary case 3:20-ap-3172 closed (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
6 6 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 04/21 11:26 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order dismissing adversary proceeding with prejudice (related document # []). Entered on 4/19/2021 (Bradden, T.)
Monday, April 19, 2021
5 5 order Dismiss adversary case Mon 04/19 2:39 PM
Order dismissing adversary proceeding with prejudice Related [+]. Entered on 4/19/2021 (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-] []
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Wed 11/25 11:14 AM
Summons service executed on SCRIPPS Media, Inc. 11/25/2020 (Sebesta, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2020 (Tello, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Mon 11/23 9:51 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 5/4/2021 at 01:15 PM at Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 11/23/2020 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Summons issued Mon 11/23 9:49 AM
Summons issued on SCRIPPS Media, Inc. Answer Due 12/23/2020 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/19 1:25 PM
Adversary case 20-03172 Complaint by James W. Cunningham, Chapter 7 Trustee against SCRIPPS MEDIA, INC. dba SCRIPPS, KIVI, KMGH, and KNXV. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 12 Related [+]. 13. 14. (Sebesta, Michael)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit A