Cecchi Gori Pictures et al v. BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corpo
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-53499
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-53499
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | M Elaine Hammond |
Case #: | 5:20-ap-05053 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cecchi Gori Pictures
21650 Oxnard Street, Suite 500
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cecchi Gori USA, Inc.
21650 Oxnard Street, Suite 500
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 12, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Change of Address (Multi)
Wed 01/12 10:19 AM
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Firm Name . (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/09 1:01 PM
Adversary Case Closed 5:20-ap-5053. (rs) |
||
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 07/23 2:10 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Management Action due after 8/6/2021. (acr) |
|
Sunday, June 27, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/27 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 06/27/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 25, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
court
Transcript
Fri 06/25 11:28 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 6/21/2021 RE: MOTION TO DISMISS DEBTORS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 24) FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, A PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY CORPORATION (26) i) OPPOSITION FILED BY PLAINTIFF (29). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber, eScribers, LLC - 973-406-2250. eScribers, LLC; 973-406-2250 . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/2/2021. Redaction Request Due By 07/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/26/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/23/2021. (Gottlieb, Jason) |
|
37 | 37
court
Transcript
Fri 06/25 11:26 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 3/22/2021 RE: MOTION TO DISMISS DEBTOR'S COMPLAINT FOR AIDING AND ABETTING FRAUDULENT TRANSFERS FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, A PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY CORPORATION (10) i) OPPOSITION FILED BY PLAINTIFFS (17) ii) REPLY FILED BY BARCLAYS BANK, PLC (19). THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber, eScribers, LLC - 973-406-2250. eScribers, LLC; 973-406-2250 . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/2/2021. Redaction Request Due By 07/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/26/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/23/2021. (Gottlieb, Jason) |
|
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
order
Stipulation
Thu 06/24 11:49 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Continue Scheduling Conference . (acr) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Thu 06/24 11:51 AM
Hearing Continued . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/18/2021 at 10:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (acr) |
||
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
stip
Continue Hearing
Wed 06/23 1:44 PM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc.. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Transcript Order Form (Public Request)
Wed 06/23 1:42 PM
Transcript Order Form regarding Hearing Date 6/21/2021. Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Transcript Order Form (Public Request)
Wed 06/23 1:39 PM
Transcript Order Form regarding Hearing Date 3/22/2021. Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
court
Transcript Record Transmittal
Wed 06/23 5:36 PM
Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded) for Order Number: 20-05053 34 Regarding Hearing Date: 6/21/2021. Transcription Service Provider: e-Scribers, Contact Information: operations@escribers.net . (aw) |
||
court
Transcript Record Transmittal
Wed 06/23 7:49 PM
Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded) for Order Number: 20-05053 33 Regarding Hearing Date: 3/22/2021. Transcription Service Provider: e-Scribers, Contact Information: operations@escribers.net . (aw) |
||
Monday, June 21, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
audio
audio
Mon 06/21 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/21/2021 11:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 41597 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:43:20 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Mon 06/21 11:50 AM
Hearing Held . Appearances: Ross Firsenbaum on behalf of the movant and Jason Komorsky for the plaintiff. The motion to dismiss is under submission. The court will issue a decision. (acr) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Reply
Mon 06/14 4:12 PM
Reply . Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/07 11:29 AM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Opposition Brief/Memorandum
Mon 06/07 11:28 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, May 25, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 05/25 1:36 PM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2021 at 11:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
court
Hearing Dropped
Tue 05/25 10:35 AM
Hearing Dropped . (acr) |
||
Friday, May 21, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 05/21 1:32 PM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 6/21/2021 at 11:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation. (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/21 1:28 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Dismiss Debtors' First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 24 ) Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation. (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Ross E. Firsenbaum | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Redline Comparison | ||
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/23 8:29 AM
Certificate of Service re First Amended Complaint . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
24 | 24
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/23 8:26 AM
Amended Complaint for Aiding and Abetting Fraud and Aiding and Abetting Fraudulent Transfers by Jason B. Komorsky on behalf of Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. against BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation. Added the following nature of suit(s): Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer; . (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
order
Continue Hearing
Wed 03/31 3:04 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference . Hearing scheduled for 7/12/2021 at 10:00 AM Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars for 1 , . (rdr) |
|
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Continue Hearing
Tue 03/30 5:07 PM
Stipulation to Continue Hearing Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. . (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/23 12:27 PM
Order Granting Motion To Dismiss . (acr) |
|
20 | 20
audio
audio
Mon 03/22 10:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/22/2021 11:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 56923 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:59:18 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Mon 03/22 12:27 PM
Hearing Held . Appearances: Jason Komorsky and Jessica Bagdanov for plaintiff and Alyson Zureick, Ross Firsenbaum and Chris Johnstone for Barclays Bank PLC. The motion to dismiss is granted with leave to amend. The court will issue the order. Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 4/21/21 and defendant to file an answer no later than 5/21/21. (acr) |
||
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Reply
Mon 03/15 7:39 PM
Reply . Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/08 1:08 PM
Certificate of Service re Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Opposition Brief/Memorandum
Mon 03/08 1:02 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Debtors' Complaint for Aiding and Abetting Fraudulent Transfers . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Fri 03/05 1:08 PM
Hearing Continued . Hearing scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 10:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Rescheduled by the court due to a scheduling conflict. (acr) |
||
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
order
Admission for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/17 10:40 AM
Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . (acr) |
|
Monday, February 15, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
order
Admission for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/16 9:13 AM
Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . (acr) |
|
14 | 14
order
Admission for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/16 9:12 AM
Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . (acr) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Fri 02/12 9:16 AM
Receipt Number 26R8HV1F, Fee Amount $317.00 . (jf) |
||
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/12 9:11 AM
Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Philip D. Anker . Fee Amount $317 (klr) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 02/11 6:39 PM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2021 at 11:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation. (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Request to Take Judicial Notice
Thu 02/11 6:35 PM
Request To Take Judicial Notice . Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - G&G Productions Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Israilovici Complaint | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Andrew De Camara, the Debtors Chief Executive Officer, and Exhibits 3 and 4 thereto | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Carlo Dipasquale, and Exhibit 2 thereto | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Nepomuceno Complaint | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Opposition to Motion to Dismiss | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 02/11 6:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation. (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/11 6:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement. Corporate Parent, Barclays PLC has been added. Filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation (Johnstone, Chris) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/11 5:56 PM
Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of Alyson M. Zureick, . Fee Amount $317 (Zureick, Alyson) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/11 5:42 PM
Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of Ross E. Firsenbaum, . Fee Amount $317 (Firsenbaum, Ross) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 02/11 5:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice 20-05053 [motion,mprohac] ( 317.00). Receipt number 31097690, amount $ 317.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
none
Thu 02/11 5:57 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice 20-05053 [motion,mprohac] ( 317.00). Receipt number 31097702, amount $ 317.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 01/12 12:08 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1 . Filed by Plaintiffs Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 01/12 11:15 AM
Alias Summons Service Executed on BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation 1/12/2021 . (Komorsky, Jason) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 01/12 10:02 AM
Alias Summons Issued on BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation Answer Due 2/11/2021 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/6/2021 at 10:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lj) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
cmp
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued
Mon 01/11 3:06 PM
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued on BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation. Reason: original summons was not timely served. . (Komorsky, Jason) |
||
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
order
Discovery
Tue 12/15 11:24 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lj) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Tue 12/15 11:23 AM
Summons Issued on BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation Answer Due 1/14/2021 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/8/2021 at 10:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lj) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/14 12:28 PM
Adversary case[LINK 20-05053 . 14 , 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) Complaint by Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. against BARCLAYS BANK, PLC, a Professional Liability Corporation. Fee Amount $350. (Komorsky, Jason) |