Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:20-cv-01952
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2020
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jun 13, 2021 7:09 AM EDT
Defendant
AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION INC.
Represented By
John C. Conti
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Steven L. Ettinger
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey J. Wetzel
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
Howard A. Chajson
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Defendant
KATHRYN BERLACHER
Represented By
Allison R. Brown
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Taylor N. Brailey
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Terrence H. Murphy
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Theodore A. Schroeder
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
MARK GLADWIN
Represented By
Allison R. Brown
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Taylor N. Brailey
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Terrence H. Murphy
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Theodore A. Schroeder
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
SAMIR SABA
Represented By
Allison R. Brown
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Taylor N. Brailey
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Terrence H. Murphy
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Theodore A. Schroeder
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
MARC SIMON
Represented By
John C. Conti
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Steven L. Ettinger
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C.
contact info
Bryon M Chowka
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Jeffrey J. Wetzel
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
Robert J. Ridge
Clark Hill, PLC
contact info
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH
Represented By
Jeremy D. Engle
Marcus & Shapira LLP
contact info
Bruce Berman
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Molly Maureen Jennings
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Leon Kenworthy
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Allison R. Brown
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Taylor N. Brailey
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Terrence H. Murphy
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Theodore A. Schroeder
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH PHYSICIANS
Represented By
Allison R. Brown
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Taylor N. Brailey
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Terrence H. Murphy
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Theodore A. Schroeder
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Defendant
WILEY PERIODICALS, INC.
Represented By
Leslie Minora
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Michael Berry
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David S. Fryman
Ballard, Spahr, Andrews & Ingersoll
contact info
Plaintiff
NORMAN WANG
Represented By
Shawn M Rodgers
Goldstein Law Partners, LLC
contact info
Michelle Ann Scott
Center For Individual Rights
contact info
Michael Rosman
Center For Individual Rights
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 46 AHA's Motion to Dismiss; 48 Dr. Simon's Motion to Dismiss; 50 Wiley Periodicals' Motion to Dismiss; 52 Dr. Berlacher, Dr. Gladwin, Dr. Saba, University of Pittsburgh Medical Center, and University of Pittsburgh Physicians' Partial Motion to Dismiss; and 54 University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated herein, the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss will be granted. A separate Order to follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/21/2021. (dmm)
GPO Apr 04 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 82 Defendant University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss and 84 Defendants Dr. Gladwin, Dr. Saba, and Dr. Berlacher's Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated herein, Defendant University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss will be granted and Defendants Dr. Gladwin, Dr. Saba, and Dr. Berlacher's Motion to Dismiss will be denied. A separate Order to follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/4/2022. (dmm)
GPO Aug 31 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 95 Defendant University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss will be granted. Plaintiff will not be granted leave to amend. Defendant University of Pittsburgh will be dismissed from the case. A separate Order to follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/31/2022. (dmm)
GPO Jun 14 2023
ORDER denying 136 University of Pittsburgh's Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/14/2023. (dmm)
GPO Aug 15 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 132 Report and Recommendation. The Report and Recommendation will be adopted in part and modified in part. Plaintiff's Objections as to the name "Third Amendment of Relationship Agreement" and e-Discovery of Dr. Bump's email and text message communications will be sustained. In all other respects, Plaintiff's Objections will be overruled. A separate Order to follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/15/2023. (dmm)
GPO Aug 22 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 165 Defendant University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant the University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss will be denied in part and granted in part. The University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss will be denied as to Dr. Wang's Title VII and PHRA retaliation claims related to his statements made at the July 31, 2020 meeting. The University of Pittsburgh's Motion to Dismiss will be granted as to Dr. Wang's Title VII and PHRA retaliation claims related to the statements made within his article. Dr. Wang will not be granted leave to amend with regard to the statements made within his article. A separate Order to follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/22/2023. (dmm)
GPO Mar 26 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment at ECF Nos. 184 and 189, will be granted. A separate order to follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/26/2025. (cjm)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
223 223 appeal USCA Appeal Fees Mon 04/28 2:39 PM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 605 receipt number 2000013982 re221 Notice of Appeal, filed by NORMAN WANG (sdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
222 222 appeal Letter to pay appeal filing fee Fri 04/25 11:38 AM
LETTER from Clerk to NORMAN WANG re221 Notice of Appeal, to pay appeal filing fee or submit a motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. (sdp)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Wrong event selected Fri 04/25 11:27 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re220 Notice. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Notice of Appeal. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
221 221 appeal Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Required) Fri 04/25 11:35 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to218 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by NORMAN WANG. Filing Fee Due. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (sdp)
Related: [-]
220 220 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Thu 04/24 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by NORMAN WANG Related [+]
Related: [-] nner, John