Member Case
Lead case is: 3:20-bk-42793

Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Alston
Case #: 2:20-bk-13085
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2020
Terminated:Jan 11, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Renton Healthcare Rehabilitation Center, LLC
80 SW 2nd St
Renton, WA 98057-5937
Represented By
Christine M Tobin-Presser
Bush Kornfeld LLP
contact info
Thomas A Buford
Bush Kornfeld LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Matthew J.P. Johnson
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, January 11, 2021
order Close Transferred Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/11 8:40 AM
CLOSED. Transferred Bankruptcy Case Closed. Transferred to the Tacoma Divisional Office, 20-42800 BDL. (RQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
utility Repeat Filer Tue 12/22 4:54 AM
** Repeat Filer ** for debtor Renton Healthcare Rehabilitation Center, LLC Case Number[LINK 20-42800 , Chapter 11 filed in Washington Western Bankruptcy Court on 12/18/2020.(Admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 21, 2020
6 6 order ~Generic~ Order Mon 12/21 7:39 AM
ORDER Reassigning Case to Judge Brian D Lynch and Transferred to the Tacoma Divisional Office . (RQC) Modified on 12/21/2020 (RQC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/18 4:04 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Matthew J.P. Johnson on behalf of United States Trustee. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Received UNSIGNED Order Fri 12/18 4:02 PM
Related: [-]
3 3 ans Declaration Fri 12/18 3:39 PM
Declaration of Eric Orse in Support of Debtors' Ex Parte Emergency Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) Related [+]... Filed by Christine M Tobin-Presser on behalf of Renton Healthcare Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Tobin-Presser, Christine)
Related: [-] 2 Motion
2 2 3 pgs motion ~generic~ Motion Fri 12/18 3:38 PM
Ex Parte Motion --Debtors' Ex Parte Emergency Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) .. Filed by Christine M Tobin-Presser on behalf of Renton Healthcare Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Tobin-Presser, Christine)
Related: [-]
1 1 82 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 (OTC) Fri 12/18 2:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Non-Individual. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 01/19/2021 Filed by Thomas A Buford on behalf of Renton Healthcare Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Buford, Thomas)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 12/18 2:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition( 20-13085 [misc,1032] (1738.00). Receipt number A26837078. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Creditors Uploaded Fri 12/18 3:02 PM
Creditor matrix uploaded/added 210 creditor(s). (admin)
Related: [-]