William Colbert v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-04381 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:20-cv-10997 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 15, 2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I DuPont De Nemours Company Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwall, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
William Colbert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, December 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 12/18 5:03 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: California Central, 2:20-cv-10997, William Colbert v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:20-cv-4381-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 12, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C 10.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 1/15/2021 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
12 | 12
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 12/18 4:50 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-10997. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 Conditional Transfer Order - 40 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2873, transferring case to USDC, District of South Carolina and assigned to Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, (Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Propram; Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application Due [to S. James Boumil] Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application Due [to Konstantine Kyros] served on December 4, 2020. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] (Entered: 12/04/2020) | |
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Konstantine Kyros. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney S. James Boumil. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 12/3/2020. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, identifying 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV29200 Receipt No: ACACDC-29339628 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attorney Daniel David Queen added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Inc., Does, Dynax Corporation, E.I. Dupont De Nemours & Co., Kidde Fire Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., Kidde-Fenwall, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The Chemours Co., The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products, LP, UTC Fire & Security America's, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff William Colbert. (filed in state court 8/3/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 12/18/2020.] |