Washington Western District Court
Judge:Marsha J Pechman
Case #: 2:20-cv-01837
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2020
Terminated:Apr 08, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 21, 2021 3:15 AM PDT
Defendant
William J Widmer
Represented By
Andrew S DeCarlow
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Angelo J Calfo
Calfo Eakes LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Kyle A. Forsyth
Us Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 08, 2022
24 24 order Judgment by Court Fri 04/08 4:43 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. Defendant shall pay $1,464,000 in restitution to the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as required by the consent order he entered into on 10/27/2014, within 30 days, plus postjudgment interest at a rate prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, pursuant to payment instructions to be provided by the United States Attorneys Office. (SB)
Related: [-]
23 23 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Cross Motion Fri 04/08 4:41 PM
ORDER denying Defendant's13 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Plaintiff's17 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court ORDERS Defendant to pay $1,464,000 in restitution to FDIC within 30 days, plus postjudgment interest at a rate prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1961, pursuant to payment instructions to be provided by the United States Attorney's Office. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
22 22 minutes In Court Hearing Tue 03/29 3:15 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Grant Cogswell ; Pla Counsel: Kyle Forsyth ; Def Counsel: Andrew DeCarlow ; CR: Angela Nicolavo ; Time of Hearing: 1:00PM ; Oral Argument held on 3/29/2022. The Court hears Oral argument on Motion for Summary Judgment Dkt. #13 and Cross Motion and Response, Dkt. #17 . The Court takes this matter under advisement and a written order will issue by April 8, 2022. (GC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/18 1:23 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff United States of America, TO RESPONSE to17 CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,13 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Forsyth, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/04 4:11 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant William J Widmer, TO RESPONSE to17 CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,13 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DeCarlow, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
19 19 respm Declaration Fri 01/07 3:44 PM
DECLARATION of Kyle Forsyth filed by Plaintiff United States of America re17 CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment(Forsyth, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Docket for Case No. 2_14bk12946_ William J Widmer_ Jr and Madeline Lopes Widmer,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 2014_10_21 US Trustee's Mot. for SJ to Deny Discharge to Widmer,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 2014_11_21 Excerpts of Transciprt of Hrg. on Trustee's SJ Mot,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 2014_11_24 SJ Order Denying Discharge to Widmer,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 2017_05_25 Ch. 7 Trustee's Final Account and Distribution Report without Exhibits,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Widmer's Discovery Responses,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Widmer's e-mails w OCC
18 18 respm Declaration Fri 01/07 3:32 PM
DECLARATION of Robert Ferrer filed by Plaintiff United States of America re17 CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment(Forsyth, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Final Receivership Balance Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Corp. Purchase & Assumption Agreement
17 17 motion Cross Motion Fri 01/07 3:25 PM
CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 2/18/2022, (Forsyth, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting US SJ Motion
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
utility Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public, notice to parties) Tue 12/14 8:13 AM
Noting Date Set/Reset re Defendant's13 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Noting Date 2/18/2022. (SB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 12/13 2:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Judge Tana Lin no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Tana Lin. (GC)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 12/13 8:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. Judge Marsha J. Pechman no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
14 14 respm Declaration Fri 12/10 4:18 PM
DECLARATION of Andrew DeCarlow filed by Defendant William J Widmer re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DeCarlow, Andrew)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Fri 12/10 4:16 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant William J Widmer. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 2/18/2021, (DeCarlow, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
12 12 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/23 4:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/10/2021; Plaintiff's combined Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due 28 days after Defendant's Motion; Defendant's combined Opposition and Reply due 28 days after Plaintiff's combined Opposition and Cross-Motion; Plaintiff's Reply due 14 days after Defendant's combined Opposition and Reply. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SB) Modified on 11/23/2021 to indicate deadline for Plaintiff's reply. (SB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
11 11 order MJP Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates(FORM) Mon 05/24 1:30 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *2 days*. Jury Trial is set for 7/18/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 6/21/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/20/2021, Motions due by 1/19/2022, Discovery completed by 11/5/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/21/2022, Motions in Limine due by 6/13/2022, Pretrial Order due by 7/5/2022, Trial briefs to be submitted by 7/5/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/5/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. A briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment will follow the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
10 10 misc Joint Status Report Fri 05/14 9:51 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 2. (Forsyth, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/26 3:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, to Enforce Compliance with Consent Order with JURY DEMAND by William J Widmer.(DeCarlow, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 03/24 11:25 AM
Attorney Andrew S DeCarlow added as counsel for William J Widmer per8 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/23 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendant William J Widmer. (Calfo, Angelo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
7 7 utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/29 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. FRCP 26(f) deadline 4/30/2021, initial disclosure deadline is 5/7/2021, and Joint Status Report is due by 5/14/2021. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
6 6 service Waiver of Service Tue 01/26 5:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant William J Widmer mailed on 1/25/2021 (Forsyth, Kyle)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Tue 01/26 7:59 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/23/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/2/2021. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/22 1:06 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant William J Widmer (different address) (PM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
3 3 misc Praecipe for a Summons Thu 01/21 1:57 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff United States of America(Forsyth, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, December 28, 2020
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 12/28 11:42 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) William J Widmer (SG)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 12/28 11:31 AM
Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/23 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT to Enforce Compliance with Consent Order against defendant(s) William J Widmer Attorney Kyle A. Forsyth added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America.(Forsyth, Kyle) (No Fee Required)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons