Hawaii District Court
Judge:J Michael Seabright
Referred: Kenneth J Mansfield
Case #: 1:20-cv-00568
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2020
Terminated:Sep 27, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jun 20, 2021 11:35 PM HST
Defendant
H&R Block
Represented By
Jessica M. Sneed
Es&a, Inc.
contact info
Anna M. Elento-Sneed
Es&a, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa Loftus
Email: TLL1205@gmail.com 3134 Hinano St
Honolulu, HI 96815

GPO Sep 27 2021
ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, ECF NO. 20; AND (2) DISMISSING ACTION - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/27/2021.     For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration, ECF No. 20, is GRANTED and the court DISMISSES the action. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case file. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Teresa Loftus will be served by First Class Mail on September 27, 2021 to the address of record listed on the (NEF).

Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM HST
Monday, September 27, 2021
31 31 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 09/27 12:38 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered 9/27/2021 pursuant to ECF30 ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, ECF NO. 20; AND (2) DISMISSING ACTION (jo) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Teresa Loftus will be served by First Class Mail on September 27, 2021 to the address of record listed on the (NEF)
Related: [-]
30 30 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 09/27 12:28 PM
ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, ECF NO.20 ; AND (2) DISMISSING ACTION - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/27/2021. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration, ECF No. 20 , is GRANTED and the court DISMISSES the action. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case file. (jo) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Teresa Loftus will be served by First Class Mail on September 27, 2021 to the address of record listed on the (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 25, 2021
29 29 minutes Link 3 - Set Ripe Deadline Wed 08/25 10:08 AM
EO: On August 25, 2021, the court received email notification from pro se Plaintiff Teresa Loftus explaining that she plans to return to Hawaii and "will be back at [her] Army job" on September 6, 2021. ECF No.28 . Given this information, Plaintiff's deadline to file her Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration ("Motion"), ECF No. 20 , is extended to September 13, 2021. That is, Plaintiff must file her Opposition on or before September 13, 2021. The court warns Plaintiff that this is her final opportunity to file an Opposition to the Motion. Defendant's optional Reply is now due on or before September 20, 2021. Thereafter, the court will rule on the Motion based on the filings on the record. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Letter Wed 08/25 9:51 AM
Email to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Plaintiff Teresa Loftus, dated August 25, 2021, Re: August 23, 2021 deadline to file Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (jo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
27 27 minutes Link Mon 08/09 2:57 PM
EO: As indicated at the August 9, 2021 hearing, Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF No.20 , is due on or before August 23, 2021. Defendant's optional Reply is due on or before August 30, 3021. After reviewing the filings, the court will determine whether to hold a hearing on the Motion to Compel Arbitration, or to decide the Motion without a hearing under Local Rule 7.1(c). (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing 3 - Set Ripe Deadline Mon 08/09 11:21 AM
EP: Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration not held. Pro Se Plaintiff, Ms. Loftus, participated by telephone. Discussion held regarding Ms. Loftus' failure to file an Opposition to Defendant's motion by the deadline provided in ECF No. 22. Ms. Loftus informed the Court that she is in the process of retaining counsel. The Court directed Ms. Loftus to file an Opposition by August 23, 2021. Defendant's optional reply due by August 30, 2021. Related [+] (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT) (rlfh) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-] porter-Cynthia Fazio
Wednesday, August 04, 2021
25 25 minutes Link Wed 08/04 1:27 PM
EO: Hearing on Defendant H&R Block's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration set for 08/09/2021 at 10:00 AM will be held in Aha Kaulike. The Court will allow Plaintiff to participate by telephone. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
24 24 minutes Link 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 07/09 8:58 AM
EO: In light of the23 Email Letter from Pro Se Plaintiff Teresa Loftus the Court VACATES the Status Conference set for 07/09/2021. Cancellation of the 07/09/2021 status conference does not alter any of the deadlines issued by Chief Judge Michael Seabright as to 20 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). This Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Letter Fri 07/09 8:50 AM
EMAIL LETTER from Pro Se Plaintiff Teresa Loftus dated 07/09/2021 regarding 07/09/2021 Status Conference. (bbb)
Related: [-]
misc Court's Certificate of Service Fri 07/09 8:54 AM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of23 Email Letter has been served via email to Pro Se Plaintiff Teresa Loftus at the verified email address of TLL1205@gmail.com on 07/09/2021. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
22 22 minutes Link Thu 07/01 8:07 AM
EO: On June 29, 2021, Defendant H&R Block filed a Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration ("Motion"). ECF No.20 . The hearing on the Motion is set for August 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. ECF No. 21 . Pro se Plaintiff Teresa Loftus is directed to file an Opposition to the Motion by July 19, 2021. Defendant's optional Reply is due by July 26, 2021. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 06/29 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion -20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration is set for 08/09/2021 at 10:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Given the current public health crisis, the court will notify the parties in due course whether the hearing will be held in court, by video conference, by telephone conference, or whether the matter will be submitted without a hearing under Local Rule 7.1(c).(CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Compel Tue 06/29 1:10 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Court Proceedings Pending Arbitration Anna M. Elento-Sneed appearing for Defendant H&R Block(Elento-Sneed, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration of Shasta Sanders,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/29 1:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by H&R Block identifying Other Affiliate H&R Block, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate HRB Resources LLC for H&R Block..(Elento-Sneed, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 25, 2021
18 18 minutes Status Conference 2 - Set Hearings Mon 06/28 2:32 PM
EO: FURTHER TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 06/25/2021. Ms. Sneed informs the Court that Ms. Loftus has been non responsive to the attempts of counsel to further discuss the case. Further Telephonic Status Conference is set for 07/09/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Until further notice, for all hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030 Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). This Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
17 17 minutes Status Conference 2 - Set Hearings Mon 05/24 2:32 PM
EP: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 05/24/2021. Parties to file a stipulation on correctly naming defendant as H&R Resources LLC. Ms. Sneed informs the court that the parties have entered in arbitration. Further Telephonic Status Conference is set for June 25, 2021 @ 9:30 a.m. beforeMagistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield. Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030 Access Code is 2123668 (AT&T Service / 9:13 - 9:20) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). This Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
16 16 service Certificate of Service Wed 04/28 11:11 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by H&R Block re15 Notice of Appearance of Counsel For Defendant H&R Block Enterprises LLC [Re: Jessica M. Sneed] (Sneed, Jessica)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/28 8:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M. Sneed on behalf of H&R Block on behalf of H&R Block.(Sneed, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/28 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna M. Elento-Sneed on behalf of H&R Block on behalf of H&R Block.(Elento-Sneed, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 26, 2021
13 13 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Mon 04/26 3:24 PM
EO: To allow sufficient time for parties to answer and for parties to meet, the Status Conference previously set for 04/29/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 05/24/2021 at 9:00 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030 Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/22 12:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Loftus. H&R Block served on 4/19/2021. (jo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
11 11 minutes Rule 16 Scheduling Conference 2 - Set Hearings Tue 03/30 4:12 PM
EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE not held. The Courtroom Manager will mail Ms. Loftus the following documents: 1) a Pro Se Packet; 2) a copy of 1 Employment Discrimination Complaint; 3) the original 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; 4) a copy of the 7 issued Summons. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 04/29/2021 at 9:30 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030 Access Code is 2123668 (AT&T Service / 9:00 - 9:02 and 9:10 - 9:18) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
misc Court's Certificate of Service Tue 03/30 4:19 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of1 Employment Discrimination Complaint;4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference;7 issued Summons and Pro Se packet has been emailed to Plaintiff Teresa Loftus as the verified email address of TLL1205@gmail.com on 03/30/2021. (bbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
10 10 minutes Link Thu 03/25 3:59 PM
AMENDED 9 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 9:30 a.m. IS ADVANCED TO 9:00 a.m. on the same date of 03/30/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD via telephone. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030 Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Thu 03/25 3:14 PM
EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 9:30 a.m. IS CONTINUED TO 9:00 a.m. on the same date of 03/30/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD via telephone. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030 Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
8 8 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Thu 02/11 3:14 PM
EO: To allow sufficient time for the Plaintiff to serve the Defendant, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 02/22/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 03/30/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 03/23/2021. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030 Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb, ) COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 02/11 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to H&R Block (jo)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Filing Fee Received Thu 02/11 1:27 PM
Filing fee received: $400.00; receipt number HI030168 re1 Complaint (jo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
5 5 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/20 3:41 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ECF NO.2 , AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL, ECF NO. 3 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/20/2021. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 2 , and Request for Appointment of Counsel, ECF No. 3 , are DENIED without prejudice to filing new motions. By February 10, 2021, Plaintiff must do one of the following: (1) file a new, fully-completed, IFP Application in accordance with this order; or (2) pay the $400 filing fee. Failure to comply with (1) or (2) will result in automatic dismissal of this action. (jo) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Teresa Loftus will be served by First Class Mail on January 21, 2021 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
4 4 1 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Wed 12/23 3:47 PM
Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 2/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/23/2020. (jo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo from Clerk Re Corporate Disclosures
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 12/23 3:42 PM
REQUEST For Appointment of Counsel Under the Civil Rights Act of 1964; 42 U.S.C. § 2000e-5(f)(1)(B); Declaration in Support of Request - filed by Plaintiff Teresa Loftus (jo)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/23 3:39 PM
APPLICATION To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) - filed by Plaintiff Teresa Loftus (jo)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/23 3:37 PM
EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against H&R Block - filed by Teresa Loftus (jo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons
misc Court's Certificate of Service Wed 12/23 4:02 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - copies of ECF Nos.1 ,2 ,3 , and4 will be served by First Class Mail on December 28, 2020 to Teresa Loftus at the address of record. (jo)
Related: [-]