Grasberg v. New York City Department of Education et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-10994 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other) |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 21, 2021 5:43 AM EDT |
Defendant
Deana Folchetti
|
|
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
|
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Welsome
|
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Grasberg
7920 155 Avenue
Howard Beach, NY 11414 |
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Tue 01/05 2:21 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:21-cv-00048, filed on 01/05/2021. (sjo) |
||
Wednesday, December 30, 2020 | ||
misc
Mail Order by USPS
Wed 12/30 11:30 AM
Mailed a copy of3 Order, to Michelle Grasberg at 7920 155 Avenue, Howard Beach, NY 11414. (dsh) |
||
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/30 10:52 AM
TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in the Southern District of New York. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/29/2020) (mro) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Tue 12/29 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) |
||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Tue 01/05 9:52 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(mro) |
||
Wednesday, December 23, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/29 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Deana Folchetti, New York City Department of Education, Elizabeth Welsome. Document filed by Michelle Grasberg.(rdz) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 12/29 12:38 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Michelle Grasberg..(rdz) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 12/29 12:44 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz) |