Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:21-cv-00041
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2021
Case in other court:Arizona, 2:20-cv-02378
Last checked: Sunday Jul 04, 2021 3:07 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jamie Lynne Halavais
Husch Blackwell Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Claire E F Eichmann
Husch Blackwell Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Ian Matthew Fischer
Husch Blackwell Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Eduino N Pinheiro
Represented By
Michael Craig McKay
Mckay Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
37 37 motion Reconsideration Thu 04/03 5:21 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re36 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Eduino N Pinheiro.(Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Behram V. Parekh in Support,
Att: 2 A - E. Pinheiro Deposition Transcript
Monday, March 31, 2025
36 36 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 03/31 3:20 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 324: ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MONSANTOS MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT KEVIN KNOPF AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
35 35 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 11/15 5:41 PM
STIPULATION regarding governing State Law filed by Eduino N Pinheiro. (Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 10/30 4:02 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 296: ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERTS STEWART, SWIGER, HAUGH, LUSTIG, WELCH-DUJARDIN, AND MACLEAN. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
33 33 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 10/18 2:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 11/1/2024 MOTION HEARINGS. The Court will schedule hearings on an as-needed basis. Parties will be notified which motions will be heard on which day via the docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
32 32 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 10/14 11:35 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byMonsanto Company.(Marshall, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Kristan Aronson
Att: 1 Declaration Linda C. Hsu,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - 702 Reply Appendix,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Omnibus 702 to exclude Wave VII general-causation experts,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - 2024-08-09 Amended Motion Exclude dckt 18995_0,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Alesi Trial Transcript excerpts,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Ferro Trial Transcript excerpts,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Pilliod Trial Transcript excerpts,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Chang and Delzell (2016)
Sunday, October 13, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Sun 10/13 1:10 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byMonsanto Company. (Hsu, Linda)
Related: [-] 22 MOTION EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEVIN KNOPF AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Monday, September 30, 2024
30 30 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 09/30 9:38 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byEduino N Pinheiro.(Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-] 22 MOTION EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEVIN KNOPF AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Att: 1 Declaration of Behram V. Parekh in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - AA
29 29 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 09/30 9:32 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byEduino N Pinheiro.(Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Kristan Aronson
Att: 1 Declaration of Behram V. Parekh in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
28 28 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/25 1:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 9/26/2024 MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY HEARINGS TO 11/1/2024. Motion Hearings set for 11/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. MDL Docket Nos.: 18951, 18952,18953,18954, 18955, 18956, 18957,18958, 18959, 18960, 18961, 18963, 18969, 18970, 18971, 18972, 18973, 18974, 18976, 18982, 18985, 18988, 18990, 18991, 18992, 18993, 18994, 18995, 19041, 19043, 19046. 19047, 19048, 19049, 19051, 19062. Associated cases: 3:16-cv-05786-VC - Harris v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:17-cv-03448-VC - Setzer et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:17-cv-05084-VC - Cryan v. Monsanto Company, 3:18-cv-01428-VC - Berenfeld v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-03014-VC - Holliday v. Monsanto Company, Inc., 3:19-cv-03786-VC - Putzrath et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05238-VC - Casale v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05310-VC - Rowland et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05345-VC - Eilmes et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05598-VC - Rhuland et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05600-VC - Hayden et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-05957-VC - Haase et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-06407-VC - Huntley v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-06423-VC - Gordon v. Monsanto Company et al,, 3:19-cv-07858-VC - Vander Groef et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:19-cv-08064-VC - Gannon v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00057-VC - Bodie v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00056-VC - Beisner v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00027-VC - Wistinghausen et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00024-VC - Glassman et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00248-VC - Fallon et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-00621-VC - Belfleur et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-01419-VC - Collins v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:20-cv-02419-VC - Finnell v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-02404-VC - Iona v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-02650-VC - Doran v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-03363-VC - Holmes v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-03433-VC - Aldoupolis et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-03444-VC - Hutchison v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-03720-VC - Coressel v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-04654-VC - Booth v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-04758-VC - Williams v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-04834-VC - COLTON v. MONSANTO COMPANY et al, 3:20-cv-05871-VC - Tudal et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-05888-VC - Gonzalez Lopez v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-05870-VC - Rubin et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-06194-VC - Romano v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-07219-VC - McDermott v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08053-VC - Skonicki v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08173-VC - Pinheiro v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:20-cv-08167-VC - Drons v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08518-VC - Daulton v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08801-VC - Penalver v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08851-VC - Thompson et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:20-cv-08847-VC - Fox v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:21-cv-00041-VC - Pinheiro v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-00172-VC - Proctor et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-00175-VC - Kay et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-00675-VC - BOATRIGHT v. MONSANTO COMPANY et al, 3:21-cv-02550-VC - Perillo v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:21-cv-02705-VC - Dominique v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-02908-VC - Stackhouse v. Monsanto Company, Inc., 3:21-cv-03297-VC - Rodgers v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-05398-VC - Hayes et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-05621-VC - Perry v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:21-cv-05971-VC - Fleischhauer et al v. Monsanto Company, 3:21-cv-06562-VC - Agosta v. Monsanto Company, Inc., 3:21-cv-07124-VC - Abel et al v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:21-cv-09937-VC - El-Hakam et al v. Monsanto Company, Inc. et al, 3:22-cv-00092-VC - Sullivan v. Monsanto Company, 3:22-cv-00358-VC - Ginkel v. Monsanto Company et al, 3:22-cv-05287-VC - Sorrell et al v. Monsanto Company. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
27 27 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 09/23 3:31 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byMonsanto Company.(Hsu, Linda)
Related: [-] 26 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Strike Monsanto Company's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Kevin Knopf re25 Supplemental Brief,,,
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 19, 2024
26 26 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 09/19 12:46 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Strike Monsanto Company's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Kevin Knopf re25 Supplemental Brief,,, filed by Eduino N Pinheiro. Responses due by 9/23/2024.(Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Behram V. Parekh in Support
Friday, September 13, 2024
25 25 oth_sup Supplemental Brief Fri 09/13 3:16 PM
Supplemental Brief re22 MOTION EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEVIN KNOPF AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byMonsanto Company. Related [+] (Hsu, Linda)
Related: [-] 22
Att: 1 Declaration Hsu,
Att: 2 Exhibit 45 Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 46 Deposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit 47 Deposition,
Att: 5 Exhibit 48 Deposition,
Att: 6 Exhibit 49 Deposition,
Att: 7 Exhibit 50 Deposition,
Att: 8 Exhibit 51 Deposition,
Att: 9 Exhibit 52 Deposition,
Att: 10 Exhibit 53 Deposition,
Att: 11 Exhibit 54 Expert Report,
Att: 12 Exhibit 55 Expert Report,
Att: 13 Exhibit 56 Record,
Att: 14 Exhibit 57 Article,
Att: 15 Exhibit 58 Article,
Att: 16 Exhibit 59 Article,
Att: 17 Exhibit 60 Record,
Att: 18 Exhibit 61 Record,
Att: 19 Exhibit 62 Article,
Att: 20 Exhibit 63 Fact Sheet
Friday, September 06, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 09/06 10:19 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byEduino N Pinheiro.(Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-] 20 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Connie Welch-DuJardin
Att: 1 Declaration of Behram V. Parekh in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Welch-DuJardin Deposition Transcript
Thursday, August 29, 2024
23 23 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 08/29 5:29 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byMonsanto Company.(Hsu, Linda)
Related: [-] 20 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Connie Welch-DuJardin
Att: 1 Declaration Hsu,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Curriculum Vitae,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Expert Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Deposition,
Att: 5 Exhibit D Expert Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 List
Friday, August 16, 2024
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/16 4:01 PM
MOTION EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DR. KEVIN KNOPF AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Monsanto Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/4/2024. Replies due by 9/12/2024.(Hsu, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Linda C. Hsu,
Att: 2 Exhibit 31 - Eilmes Rpt,
Att: 3 Exhibit 32 - Gordon Rpt,
Att: 4 Exhibit 33 - Haase Rpt,
Att: 5 Exhibit 34 - Hayden Rpt,
Att: 6 Exhibit 35 - Huntley Rpt,
Att: 7 Exhibit 36 - P. Pinheiro Rpt,
Att: 8 Exhibit 37 - E. Pinheiro Rpt,
Att: 9 Exhibit 38 - Huntley Dep [Excerpts],
Att: 10 Exhibit 39 - Gordon Rogs [Excerpts],
Att: 11 Exhibit 40 - Plaintiff Gordon Dep [Excerpts],
Att: 12 Exhibit 41 - Huntley Rcrd [Redacted],
Att: 13 Exhibit 42 - Plaintiff Eilmes Dep [Excerpts],
Att: 14 Exhibit 43 - Hayden Rcrd [Redacted],
Att: 15 Exhibit 44 - Eilmes Rcrd [Redacted]
Friday, August 09, 2024
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/09 9:50 PM
MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Kristan Aronson filed by Monsanto Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 8/30/2024. Replies due by 9/12/2024.(White, Jed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Linda Hsu,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Aronson Expert Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Tomasetti 2015 [Variation in cancer risk],
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Tomasetti 2017 [Stem cell divisions somatic mutations etc],
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Tomasetti Expert Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Alesi Transcript,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Delorme-Barton TranscriptTomasetti Daubert Hearing,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Tomasetti Deposition,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Aronson Deposition
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/09 7:25 PM
MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Connie Welch-DuJardin filed by Eduino N Pinheiro. Responses due by 8/30/2024. Replies due by 9/12/2024.(Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Behram V. Parekh in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Welch-DuJardin Expert Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Welch-DuJardin Deposition Transcript
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 07/31 4:52 PM
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 18847 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Associated Cases: 3:16-md-02741-VC; 3:19-cv-06423-VC; 3:20-cv-08173-VC; 3:21-cv-00041-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 07/18 1:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines in three Wave 7 Cases filed by Eduino N Pinheiro. (Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/07 6:23 PM
NOTICE by Eduino N Pinheiro Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Expert Disclosure (Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
16 16 3 pgs order Order Mon 08/28 12:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO MOVE CASES TO LATER WAVES. Re: Dkt. No. 17075, 17079, 17091, 17095, 1710106, 1710809, 17114, 17117, 17142, 17199, 17200, 17204, 17208, 17211, 17212, 17215, 17219, 17220. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/23/2023. (crblc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
15 15 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 08/22 5:53 PM
Consent ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Move Case to Wave 7H filed by Eduino N Pinheiro. Responses due by 8/28/2023.(Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/22 4:49 PM
Order Granting Motions to Move Cases to Later Waves by Judge Vince Chhabria in case 3:16-md-02741-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
13 13 motion Continue Wed 03/08 3:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case to Wave 6D filed by Eduino N Pinheiro.(Parekh, Behram) Modified on 3/8/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/07 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Behram Viraf Parekh (Parekh, Behram)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 07/01 4:00 PM
ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 14980 Motion to Continue case to Wave V in case 3:16-md-02741-VC; granting 10 Motion in case 3:21-cv-00041-VC. (vclc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/08 12:20 PM
First MOTION Move Case to Wave V Unopposed Motion filed by Eduino N Pinheiro. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2022 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 7/14/2022. Replies due by 7/21/2022.(McKay, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 02, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 09/02 2:23 PM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria terminating 8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 08/18 3:27 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Monsanto Company. Responses due by 9/1/2021. Replies due by 9/8/2021.(Fischer, Ian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 01/05 10:55 AM
Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:20-cv-02378. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Tue 01/05 10:57 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741, DIstrict of Arizona, 2:20-cv-02378 GMS, Pinheiro v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-00041 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 249 cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
6 6 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-249) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
5 5 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for February 12, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/9/20. (SST)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
4 4 ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company.(Fischer, Ian)
Related: [-]
3 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18957347. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 20-2378 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Fischer, Ian) (MCO)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-055746. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-18957347 filed by Monsanto Company. (Fischer, Ian)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Declaration of Service re: SUMS/CMP/CERT of COMPULSORY ARBITRATION upon Monsanto Company State Agent on 11/18/2020. (Original file in Maricopa Superior Court on 12/1/2020) (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]