Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:21-cv-00033
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2021
Terminated:Mar 02, 2022
Case in other court:236th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, T, 236-322067-20
Last checked: Saturday Jul 10, 2021 4:08 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Isotherm Inc
Represented By
Claudine G Jackson
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Blake A Bailey
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Andrea W. Paris
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Chemted LLC
Represented By
Kursten King
Joshua Graham & Associates PLLC
contact info
Ali Crocker
Crocker Russell & Associates
contact info
Counter Claimant
Kashif Khan
Represented By
Kursten King
Joshua Graham & Associates PLLC
contact info
Ali Crocker
Crocker Russell & Associates
contact info
Counter Claimant
Nasir Khan
Represented By
Kursten King
Joshua Graham & Associates PLLC
contact info
Ali Crocker
Crocker Russell & Associates
contact info
Counter Defendant
Nasir Khan
Represented By
Kursten King
Joshua Graham & Associates PLLC
contact info
Ali Crocker
Crocker Russell & Associates
contact info
Counter Defendant
Isotherm Inc
Represented By
Claudine G Jackson
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Blake A Bailey
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Andrea W. Paris
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Isotherm Inc
Represented By
Claudine G Jackson
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Blake A Bailey
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Andrea W. Paris
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nasir Khan
Represented By
Kursten King
Joshua Graham & Associates PLLC
contact info
Ali Crocker
Crocker Russell & Associates
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Chemted LLC
Represented By
Kursten King
Joshua Graham & Associates PLLC
contact info
Ali Crocker
Crocker Russell & Associates
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Kashif Khan
Represented By
Kursten King
Joshua Graham & Associates PLLC
contact info
Ali Crocker
Crocker Russell & Associates
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Isotherm Inc
Represented By
Claudine G Jackson
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Blake A Bailey
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Andrea W. Paris
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
44 44 misc Status Report Wed 03/02 11:22 AM
STATUS REPORT filed by Kashif Khan. (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
43 43 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 03/02 9:43 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Isotherm Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.42 ), filed March 1, 2022. The Court ORDERS Nasir Khan, Kashif Khan, and Chemted LLC to file a response to the motion no later than Friday, March 4. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/2/2022) (mmw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Thu 03/03 1:53 PM
Civil Case Terminated per44 and DJ chambers. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
42 42 motion Dismiss Tue 03/01 5:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Isotherm Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 28, 2022
41 41 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/28 3:23 PM
ORDER: On 1/26/2022, the parties filed a39 Joint Settlement Conference Report indicating they had settled their dispute. The next day, the Court stayed all case deadlines and ordered the parties to file appropriate dismissal papers by February 25. See Order, ECF No.40 . The docket reflects that the parties have not yet filed appropriate dismissal papers. Accordingly, the Court again ORDERS the parties to file dismissal papers by March 1. Failure to comply with the Court's deadlines may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/28/2022) (twd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
40 40 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Thu 01/27 9:22 AM
ORDER: The Court STAYS the trial setting and all other deadlines in this case and ORDERS the parties to file appropriate dismissal papers by February 25, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/27/2022) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
39 39 misc Settlement Conference Report Wed 01/26 5:05 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT filed by Isotherm Inc. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
38 38 trial Pretrial Disclosures Wed 01/12 2:10 PM
First Amended Pretrial Disclosures filed by Kashif Khan. (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
37 37 trial Pretrial Disclosures Wed 01/12 2:10 PM
First Amended Pretrial Disclosures filed by Nasir Khan. (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
36 36 trial Pretrial Disclosures Wed 01/12 1:48 PM
Pretrial Disclosures filed by Isotherm Inc. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
35 35 trial Pretrial Disclosures Wed 01/12 11:27 AM
Pretrial Disclosures filed by Kashif Khan. (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
34 34 trial Pretrial Disclosures Wed 01/12 11:26 AM
Plaintiff's Pretrial Disclosures filed by Nasir Khan. (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
33 33 trial Designation of Experts Wed 01/12 11:26 AM
Designation of Experts by Nasir Khan. (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
32 32 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 11/23 4:11 PM
ORDER: Before the Court are Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendants'28 Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint; and Defendant Isotherm, Inc.'s31 Response. The Court DENIES the Motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/23/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
31 31 respm Response/Objection Fri 11/05 5:35 PM
RESPONSE filed by Isotherm Inc re:28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 28, 2021
30 30 misc Status Report Thu 10/28 1:22 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT on Mediation filed by Isotherm Inc. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
29 29 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Tue 10/26 10:33 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's28 Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint. To facilitate resolution of this Motion, Defendants' Response is due on or before 11/5/2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/26/2021) (twd)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Leave to File Tue 10/26 8:43 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Nasir Khan (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 08, 2021
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 10/08 9:15 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT on Mediation filed by Isotherm Inc. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
26 26 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Thu 10/07 10:30 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS the parties to file the joint mediation report by October 8, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/7/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 05/03 12:16 PM
ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S22 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT COUNTERCLAIM filed by Isotherm Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 05/03 11:45 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Isotherm, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (ECF No.23 ), filed May 3, 2021. Having considered the Unopposed Motion, and good cause being shown, the Court finds that it should be and is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to file Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Third-Party Defendant's Counterclaim (ECF No.23 -1) attached to its Motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/3/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/03 10:36 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim filed by Isotherm Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Answer to Counterclaim,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 15, 2021
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Counterclaim Thu 04/15 11:59 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Isotherm Inc filed by Nasir Khan, Kashif Khan, Chemted LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT COUNTERCLAIM against Isotherm Inc filed by Nasir Khan, Kashif Khan, Chemted LLC. (pef)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 04/15 11:15 AM
ORDER: Having considered the Unopposed18 Motion, the Court finds that it should be and is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Third-Party Defendant Counterclaim (ECF No.18 -1) attached to its Motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/15/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
20 20 respm Response/Objection Wed 04/14 1:42 PM
RESPONSE filed by Isotherm Inc re:18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleadings (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 04/14 11:01 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (ECF No.18 ), filed April 13, 2021. To efficiently resolve the Motion, the Court ORDERS Defendant to file any response by April 23, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/14/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
18 18 motion Leave to File Tue 04/13 5:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleadings filed by Nasir Khan (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment Complaint
Monday, April 12, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order Unfiling Pleading Mon 04/12 10:57 AM
ORDER STRIKING AND UNFILING DOCUMENT:16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleadings filed by Nasir Khan due to the following deficiency: A completed certificate of service is required. See FED. R. Civ. P. 5(d) or FED. R. Crim. P. 49(d). The motion or response must include: certificate of conference or inability to confer. See LR 7.1(b) or LCrR 47.1(b)., proposed order. See LR 7.1(c) or LCrR 47.1(c). A motion for leave to amend must have a copy of the proposed amended pleading attached as an exhibit. See LR 15.1(a) and (b). If the motion for leave to amend is filed on paper, the motion must be accompanied by an original and second copy of the proposed amended pleading that is neither attached to the motion nor made an exhibit to the motion. See LR 15.1(a). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/12/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
16 16 motion Leave to File Fri 04/09 2:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Pleadings filed by Nasir Khan (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
15 15 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Fri 02/12 7:45 PM
ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by Kashif Khan. Related document:7 Answer to Complaint,,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,,, Counterclaim,,,,,. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/09 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning February 22, 2022 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Counsel and the parties shall be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during this four-week period. Joinder of Parties due by 4/9/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2021. Motions due by 10/25/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/25/2021. Discovery due by 9/24/2021. Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/9/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Status Report Tue 02/09 9:32 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Isotherm Inc. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 08, 2021
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/08 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Election Regarding Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge filed by Nasir Khan (Crocker, Ali)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
11 11 service Summons Returned Fri 02/05 4:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kashif Khan ; served on 2/2/2021. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
10 10 service Summons Returned Tue 01/26 3:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chemted LLC ; served on 1/22/2021. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 01/20 10:19 AM
Third-Party Summons Issued as to Chemted LLC, Kashif Khan. (pef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
8 8 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 01/19 4:13 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Isotherm Inc. (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Summons
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Tue 01/19 3:03 PM
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint filed by Isotherm Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Chemted LLC, Kashif Khan filed by Isotherm Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Nasir Khan filed by Isotherm Inc (Bailey, Blake)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
6 6 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Wed 01/13 1:56 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
Related: [-]
5 5 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Tue 01/12 8:41 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before February 9, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/11/2021) (pef)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 01/11 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to Canon 3C(1), the undersigned has determined it is appropriate to recuse himself from this case. Therefore, the undersigned hereby recuses himself from this case. The Clerk is instructed to reassign this case to another judge. (Case is assigned to the docket of Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:21-cv-00033-O. ) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/11/2021) (mmw)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Pittman Mon 01/11 10:13 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 01/11 10:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Isotherm, Inc.. (Jackson, Claudine)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs notice Notice of Removal Mon 01/11 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Isotherm, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11498244) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jackson, Claudine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Cover Sheet Supplement,
Att: 9 Cover Sheet