Gallegos v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE) et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-80059 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Northern, 1:20-cv-07372 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 12, 2021 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pablo Gallegos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
order
Administrative Order
Tue 01/19 8:18 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 01/13 12:29 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Illinois. Case Number 1:20-cv-07372 with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80059-RLR on 1/13/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
14 | 14
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 01/13 8:21 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
13 | 13
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 01/13 8:18 AM
Case transferred in from Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-07372. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Florida the electronic record. (jh, ) | |
11 | 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. Mailed notice(jh, ) | |
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2924 Conditional Transfer Order filed 12/23/2020. (jh, ) | ||
Monday, December 28, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER: David Johnson mistakenly filed his motion to file an amended complaint9 under the wrong case number. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the motion to file an amended complaint9 from this case and refile the motion under case No. 20 C 7472, David R. Johnson v. Clare Houghteling, et al. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/28/2020. Mailed notice(jh, ) | |
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Pablo Gallegos to file Amended Complaint under 42 USC 1983 and 1985. (lw, ) | |
Thursday, December 17, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise plead6 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint within 30 days following the later of: (1) entry of an order by the JPML transferring this case to the Zantac MDL (Case No. 20-md-2924); or (2) entry of an order by the JPML denying transfer of this action. (rao, ) | |
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mylan Inc. by James David Duffy (Duffy, James) | |
6 | 6 MOTION by Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE) for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise plead (UNOPPOSED) (Coleman, Booker) | |
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Charles Scott Bracey. (jh, ) | |
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) | ||
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE) (Coleman, Booker) | |
3 | 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE) by Booker T Coleman, Jr (Coleman, Booker) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Coleman, Booker) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020-L-011038) filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (DE) Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17734712.(Coleman, Booker) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mylan's Consent to Removal |