City of Ocala, FL v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00130 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 5:20-cv-00623 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 12, 2021 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corp
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
EI Dupont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Ocala, FL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/19 6:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Ocala, FL re22 Summons Issued,21 Amended Complaint,(Vetter, Viola) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/30 5:19 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 06/07 12:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Ocala, FL. Service due by 9/5/2023 (Vetter, Viola) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 06/07 9:38 AM
ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:21-cv-00130-RMG. The motion to amend (Dkt. No. 3224 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (19) in case 2:21-cv-00130-RMG) is GRANTED and Plaintiff is directed to promptly file the amended complaint. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/7/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00130-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 05/31 6:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by City of Ocala, FL. Response to Motion due by 6/14/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00130-RMG(Vetter, Viola) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Law in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Redline Copy of Proposed Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B: Clean Copy of Proposed Amended Complaint | ||
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/27 8:19 PM
CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. In light of the most recent CMO No. 6.D filed 1/26/2021 at 1128 , please be reminded that the new shell case number for direct-filed cases related to the AFFF MDL is now 2:21-av-55555. Please file the Complaint (Civil cover sheet need not be filed), and counsel need only submit one summons document AO 440 form to be issued by the Clerk's office. Please provide the first listed defendant party's name and address on the document and attach pages which include the additional defendants' names (and addresses per CMO NO. 6, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D re Alternative For Service of Process on a Defendant ). Counsel should e-file, as an attachment to the complaint (or forward in one complete PDF via email to the Clerk's office: filingdocs_ecf_chas@scd.uscourts.gov). Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 01/13 5:08 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Middle, 5:20-cv-00623, City of Ocala FL v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-130-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 13, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 10.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 1/15/2021 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
14 | 14
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 01/13 4:59 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 5:20-cv-00623. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
13 | 13 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of South Carolina. Conditional Transfer Order. (CTO-41) MDL case number: 2873. (LAB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER granting 4 7 motions by Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Inc., and Arkema, Inc. to extend time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 30 days after Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision regarding transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/7/2021. (AR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
11 | 11 Amended NOTICE of Appearance and Notice of Designation of primary email address by Charles Roy Forman on behalf of City of Ocala, FL (Forman, Charles) Modified on 1/7/2021 (HAI). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
10 | 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/20/2021. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/6/2021. (BIA) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Roy Forman on behalf of City of Ocala, FL (Forman, Charles) Modified on 1/7/2021 (HAI). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
8 | 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P... (Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
7 | 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arkema Inc.. (Thompson, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
6 | 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. New case number: 5:20-cv-00623-Oc-37PRL. Judge James S. Moody, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (LAB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
Monday, January 04, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is instructed to reassign this case to another District Judge under the blind filing system established pursuant to the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/4/2021. (SMB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
4 | 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P.. (Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
Thursday, December 31, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/31/2020. (KAC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:20-cv-623-Orl-30PRL. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
Monday, December 28, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Fifth Judicial Circuit in and for Marion County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-1703 filed in State Court on 10/20/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17706762 filed by TYCO Fire Products L.P., Chemguard, Inc..(Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/13/2021.] | |
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Pending Motions Pending Motions, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents All Remaining State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |