Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffrey P Norman
Case #: 5:21-bk-50007
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Apr 06, 2022
Converted:Feb 16, 2022
Dismissed:Apr 06, 2022

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Xoticas Laredo L.P.
P.O. 451649
Laredo, TX 78045
Represented By
Carl Michael Barto
Law Office Of Carl M. Barto
contact info
Debtor
Xoticas Rio Grande Valley, L.P.
PO Box 451649
Laredo, TX 78045-0040
Represented By
Carl M. Barto
Law Office Of Carl M. Barto
contact info
Last checked: never
3rd Party Plaintiff
Xoticas Rio Grande Valley, L.P.
PO Box 451649
Laredo, TX 78045
Represented By
Emilio Davila, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Catherine Stone Curtis
McGinnis Lochridge P.O. BOX 720788
McAllen, TX 78504
Trustee
Catherine Stone Curtis
McGinnis Lochridge P.O. BOX 720788
McAllen, TX 78504
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
606 N Carancahua
Corpus Christi, TX 78401
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, 11
615 E. Houston Street Suite 533
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Aubrey L. Thomas
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info
Jana Smith Whitworth
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/25/2024 9:36 AM CST
Thursday, January 21, 2021
court Notice of Duplicate Case Filing Fri 01/22 3:23 PM
Previous case filed in the Southern District of Texas, Case Number 18-50035 (ChristopherSarrat)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Thu 01/21 9:47 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Xoticas Laredo L.P.. (Barto, Carl)
Related: [-]