Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Arthur J Tarnow
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:21-cv-10196
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2021
Terminated:Nov 09, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 27, 2021 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
Epic Health System of Michigan LLC
Represented By
Bethany S. Sweeny
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Exclusive Physicians PLLC
Represented By
Bethany S. Sweeny
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ali Karim
Represented By
Bethany S. Sweeny
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Greg Naman
Represented By
Bethany S. Sweeny
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ted Naman
Represented By
Bethany S. Sweeny
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Nuwell Medical Network LLC
Represented By
Bethany S. Sweeny
Kotz Sangster Wysocki P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Hoffman
Represented By
Jennifer Lossia McManus
Fagan Mcmanus, P.C.
contact info
Ryan Olivia Rosenberg
Fagan Mcmanus, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine Reed
Represented By
Jennifer Lossia McManus
Fagan Mcmanus, P.C.
contact info
Ryan Olivia Rosenberg
Fagan Mcmanus, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
22 22 2 pgs order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Tue 11/09 3:41 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
21 21 order Stipulation and Order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Mon 05/17 2:20 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Response to1 Complaint. ( Response due by 6/22/2021 . Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
20 20 2 pgs order Stipulation and Order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Tue 04/27 3:31 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Response to1 Complaint. Response due by 5/17/2021 . Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
19 19 2 pgs notice Appearance Mon 04/26 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany S. Sweeny on behalf of All Defendants. (Sweeny, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
18 18 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/20 9:30 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ali Karim served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/20 9:29 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ted Naman served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/20 9:29 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Greg Naman served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/20 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nuwell Medical Network LLC served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/20 9:27 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Exclusive Physicians PLLC served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/20 9:27 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Epic Health System of Michigan LLC served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
12 12 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/07 3:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ted Naman served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/07 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Greg Naman served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/07 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ali Karim served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/07 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Exclusive Physicians PLLC served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/07 3:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Epic Health System of Michigan LLC served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/07 3:45 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Nuwell Medical Network LLC served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
6 6 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Alternate Service Wed 03/31 10:45 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
5 5 order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge* Fri 03/12 2:31 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand:4 PLAINTIFFS' EX-PARTE PETITION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE filed by Nicole Hoffman, Catherine Reed. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Alternate Service Fri 03/12 1:19 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Alternate Service PLAINTIFFS' EX-PARTE PETITION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE by Nicole Hoffman, Catherine Reed. (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A - Verification or Process Servers
Thursday, January 28, 2021
3 3 notice Appearance Thu 01/28 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Olivia Rosenberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rosenberg, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs service Summons Issued* Thu 01/28 10:43 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Epic Health System of Michigan LLC, Exclusive Physicians PLLC, Ali Karim, Greg Naman, Ted Naman, Nuwell Medical Network LLC* (TTho)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 01/28 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8304322 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (McManus, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 01/28 10:44 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (TTho)
Related: [-]