Welch v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-80215 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 31, 2021 5:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Company
|
|
Defendant
Perrigo Research & Development Company
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017 |
|
Defendant
Ranbaxy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt USA LLC
|
|
Defendant
Wockhardt USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Institutional LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Roxane (Hikma Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd.)
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Golden State Medical Supply, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Appco Pharma LLC
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Denton Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA
|
|
Defendant
L. Perrigo Co.
|
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Welch, AR
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 16, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
Administrative Order ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Mon 09/19 12:33 PM
ORDER Deconsolidated Cases. This case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal - aty
Wed 06/29 9:34 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal FIRST AMENDED STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Kathy Welch (Fortune, Jesse) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
order
Order Striking
Tue 06/28 11:58 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER striking6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff dismisses this case as to certain Defendants, but lists fewer Defendants than are named in the Complaint5 . Pursuant to Amended Pretrial Order # 31 and Pretrial Order # 39, dismissal of less than an action in its entirety must be accomplished through amendment of the Short-Form Complaint. Should Plaintiff wish to dismiss this case as to all Defendants, Plaintiff may file an Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/28/2022. (sk01) |
||
Saturday, June 25, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Sat 06/25 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Kathy Welch. Attorney Jesse Joseph Fortune added to party Kathy Welch(pty:pla). (Fortune, Jesse) |
|
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Tue 03/09 5:30 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint and Jury Trial Demand against AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, Apotex Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Dr. Reddys Laboratories Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc., USA, Golden State Medical Supply, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., McKesson Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Perrigo Company, Perrigo Research & Development Company, Pfizer Inc., Ranbaxy, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt USA, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Mylan Institutional LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane (Hikma Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd.), filed by Kathy Welch.(Wilson, Quinn) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
order
Administrative Order
Tue 02/16 5:09 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 02/01 3:20 PM
MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81205-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (pes) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 02/01 3:10 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/01 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint and Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14318418, filed by Kathy Welch.(Wilson, Quinn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Mon 02/01 3:19 PM
Cases associated Re: 20-md-2924-RLR. (pes) |