Kenneth Boyman v. Disney Enterprises Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | John E Mcdermott |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00800 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1338 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 27, 2021 1:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Disney Enterprises Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Boyman
PO Box 694
Santa Monica, CA 90406 |
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Wed 03/17 3:19 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing) (mrgo) |
|
Att: 1 Dismissal | ||
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
order
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting (CV 104A)
Fri 03/12 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Percy Anderson, ORDERING Notice of Electronic Filing submitted by Plaintiff Kenneth Boyman received on 3/10/2021 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: No further filing will be accepted in this closed case. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 02/24 4:05 PM
ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 19-03 (CV-52)
Tue 02/23 4:36 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-00800 PA(JEMx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
order
Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Wed 02/17 11:03 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-06543 DMG(JEMx). Case transferred from Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00800 DMG(JEMx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 02/16 3:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 02/16 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 02/16 3:47 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (lh) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Tue 02/16 3:44 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kenneth Boyman. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 02/16 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendant Disney Enterprises Inc. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. (lh) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Discrepancies with Lodging of Complaint (CV-47) - optional html form
Mon 02/01 9:42 AM
NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Plaintiff Kenneth Boyman. Upon submission of your complaint, the following discrepancy was found: You have not submitted the entire filing fee amount of $ 402. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you may request that the fee be waived. To do so, you must complete, sign, and return the enclose form, Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60), in its entirety. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your your action will be dismissed. If your fee waiver request or payment is received within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned to your case. You may return your fee waiver request or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (lh) (lh) |
|
Att: 1 (2/1/2021) Lodged Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 (2/1/2021) Lodged AO121 |