Mauldin et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00366 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2021 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 5:20-cv-07212 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 04, 2021 4:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lion Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment
|
|
Plaintiff
Gary Weekley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Bebee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Vega
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Bebee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eunico Trinidad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bob Bacon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Staples
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Spellman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Tapia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bridget Tapia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rob Piper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Eden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Laurent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felix Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Mauldin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Noon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Chacon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Piper
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Tallerico
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Pizzo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Castro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Moses Salas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ed Solano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Stapp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Stelling
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Solvay Specialty Polymers USA LLC
Terminated: 04/05/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde Firefighting Inc.
Terminated: 04/20/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
Terminated: 04/20/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Royal Ten Cate US, Inc.
Terminated: 04/20/2021
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
250 | 250
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Terri Bacon, Luis Chacon, Felix Diaz, Frank Diaz, John Laurent, Teresa Mauldin, Larry Noon, Kathy Piper, Rob Piper, Mike Sanchez, Ed Solano, Todd Spellman, Dan Stapp, Mike Tallerico, Mike Tapia, Eunico Trinidad, George Vega, Gary Weekley Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00366-RMG(Pritzker, Elizabeth) |