Nessel et al v. Chemguard, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00373 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Michigan Western, 1:20-cv-01080 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 04, 2021 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Royal Chemical Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Verde Environmental, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fire Services Plus Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G.V.C. Chemical Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Hazard Control Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501 |
|
Defendant
Kiddie P.L.C., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kiddie-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Dana Nessel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michigan, State of
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Russell Martin Industries, Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2021
|
|
Defendant
Noble Industrial Supply Corporation
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pioneer Products, Inc.
Terminated: 04/01/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rockwood Systems, Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2021
|
|
Defendant
Stevens Company, Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Summit Environmental Corporation, Inc.
Terminated: 06/04/2021
|
|
Defendant
VST Chemical Corporation
Terminated: 06/04/2021
|
|
Defendant
Vulcan Fire Systems, Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2021
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Ade, Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2021
|
|
Defendant
BroCo Products, Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2021
|
|
Defendant
Cobra Fire Protection, Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2021
|
|
Defendant
Dawn Chemical Corporation of Wisconsin, Inc.
Terminated: 02/25/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Denko, Inc.
Terminated: 06/04/2021
|
|
Defendant
Ecolab Inc
Terminated: 06/04/2021
c-o Kohner Mann and Kailas 1572 E Capitol Dr
Milwaukee, WI 53211 |
|
Defendant
Hartford Chemical Sales Corporation
Terminated: 01/05/2021
|
|
Defendant
Huntington Laboratories, Inc.
Terminated: 06/04/2021
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
109 | 109
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |