California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:21-cv-01222
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2021
Terminated:Jun 07, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 09, 2021 1:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Defendant
Christopher Wray
Plaintiff
Sabtain Ali
1001 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 1013,
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, October 01, 2021
15 15 othcmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/01 4:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2nd Amended Complaint6 , filed by plaintiff Sabtain Ali(mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
14 14 order Leave Mon 09/27 11:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S TO SEEK LEAVE FOR REDACTION13 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The defendant's request is granted. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
13 13 motion Leave Thu 09/23 10:06 AM
REQUEST TO SEEK LEAVE FOR REDACTION filed by plaintiff Sabtain Ali. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
12 12 order Appoint Counsel Tue 06/08 8:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - DISMISSING CASE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:11 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel. The request to appoint counsel11 is DENIED. Plaintiff filed his amended complaint on March 3, 2021. Dkt. 6. On May 13, 2021, the Court issued an order to show cause. Dkt. 10. Plaintiff's only response was to file a request to appoint counsel. Dkt. 11. Accordingly, the case is dismissed without prejudice under Rule 4(m) for failure to serve Defendants within 90 days. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). (See document for details) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 31, 2021
11 11 motion Appointment of Counsel Thu 06/03 12:00 PM
REQUEST for a Court Appointed Attorney filed by plaintiff Sabtain Ali. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/14 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 5/27/2021.) (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
9 9 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Mon 03/08 10:04 AM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: 3rd Amended Complaint7 , 4th Amended Complaint8 , for the following reasons: Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15, a party may only amend its complaint once as a matter of course. In all other cases, amendments require leave of the Court. No leave has been sought here. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
8 8 othcmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/03 4:35 PM
FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher Wray amending Amended Complaint7 , filed by plaintiff Sabtain Ali. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
7 7 othcmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/03 4:28 PM
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher Wray amending Amended Complaint6 , filed by plaintiff Sabtain Ali. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
6 6 othcmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/03 4:26 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher Wray amending Complaint - (Discovery),1 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Sabtain Ali.(mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
5 5 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/12 3:27 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 02/11 2:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 02/11 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/11 2:16 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Alejandro Mayorkas and Christopher Wray. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 02/11 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Sabtain Ali against Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Alejandro Mayorkas, and Christopher Wray. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Filing fee $ 402 Paid). (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV71