Collins v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00608 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 29, 2021 6:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
2 Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Collins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/10 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Status Report
Thu 06/17 2:15 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 03/03 9:15 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Collins v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-608-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Middle Tennessee (sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/03 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/03 9:11 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9683006.), filed by Andrew Collins. Service due by 6/1/2021(sshe, ) |