Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: William Matthewman
Case #: 9:21-cv-80469
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2021
Re-opened:May 03, 2021
Terminated:Oct 07, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 30, 2021 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
City of Delray Beach
Represented By
D. Porpoise Evans
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole & Bierman, P.L.
contact info
Brett Jeremy Schneider
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole Bierman & Popok, P.L.
contact info
Mediator
Pamela I Perry
Plaintiff
NICOLE OFSOWITZ LUCAS
Represented By
Karen Coolman Amlong
Amlong & Amlong, PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Anthony Martinez
Terminated: 05/03/2021
Represented By
D. Porpoise Evans
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole & Bierman, P.L.
contact info
Brett Jeremy Schneider
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole Bierman & Popok, P.L.
contact info
Defendant
Scott Privitera
Terminated: 05/03/2021
Represented By
D. Porpoise Evans
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole & Bierman, P.L.
contact info
Brett Jeremy Schneider
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole Bierman & Popok, P.L.
contact info
Defendant
Javaro A Sims
Terminated: 05/03/2021
Represented By
D. Porpoise Evans
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole & Bierman, P.L.
contact info
Brett Jeremy Schneider
Weiss Serota Helfman Cole Bierman & Popok, P.L.
contact info

GPO Sep 15 2023
ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ORDER denying 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
160 160 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 11/08 12:06 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) . This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
159 159 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 11/07 3:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by City of Delray Beach (Stearns, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
158 158 appeal USCA Order Mon 11/06 4:42 PM
ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA. Motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Appellant Nicole Ofsowitz Lucas is GRANTED by clerk [10063932-2]. Pursuant to FRAP 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date re153 Notice of Appeal, filed by NICOLE OFSOWITZ LUCAS. USCA # 23-13410 G (jgo)
Related: [-]