Colorado District Court
Judge:Kristen L Mix
Case #: 1:21-cv-00688
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2021
Terminated:Jul 16, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Sep 04, 2021 3:54 AM MDT
Defendant
Quokka Brew, LLC
Represented By
Anthony James Barron
Nixon Peabody Llp-San Francisco
contact info
Plaintiff
Three Beans, LLC
Represented By
Michael Jacob Laszlo
Laszlo & Associates, Llc-Boulder
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, July 16, 2021
19 19 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 07/16 2:54 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case Text Only Entry (lgale, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Thu 07/15 7:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Three Beans, LLC (Laszlo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 07/02 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Quokka Brew, LLC answer due 7/16/2021, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/2021.(jgonz, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 06/30 4:14 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Defendant Quokka Brew, LLC.(Barron, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Extending Time To Respond To Initial Complaint
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Thu 06/24 8:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/23/21 granting14 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to1 Complaint. Quokka Brew, LLC answer due 7/2/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED sua sponte that the Scheduling Conference set for July 13, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. is VACATED, as is the July 6, 2021 deadline to file a proposed scheduling order.(nmarb, )
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 06/23 10:42 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Defendant Quokka Brew, LLC.(Barron, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order
Friday, June 18, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 06/18 11:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/18/21, granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Quokka Brew, LLC answer due 6/25/2021.(nmarb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 06/16 12:18 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Defendant Quokka Brew, LLC.(Barron, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Initial Complaint
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
11 11 order Minute Order Wed 06/09 10:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the Chief Judges General Order 2021-6 and increased access to courthouse facilities, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for July 12, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to July 13, 2021, at 2:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference will be held IN PERSON in Courtroom 401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, UNLESS permission to appear by telephone is granted by the Court following the filing of a written motion by a party. See Section C of Order Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed scheduling order shall be submitted on or before July 6, 2021. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/9/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
10 10 order Minute Order Thu 05/20 11:05 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/20/21 re:9 the parties' Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, filed by Quokka Brew, LLC. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/21 at 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESET to 7/12/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (nmarb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
9 9 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint Tue 05/18 4:18 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Defendant Quokka Brew, LLC. Quokka Brew, LLC answer due 6/18/2021. (Barron, Anthony)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 05/18 3:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Three Beans, LLC. Quokka Brew, LLC served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Laszlo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
7 7 order Minute Order Mon 05/10 9:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, all counsel or parties who wish to participate in, or members of the public who wish to listen into, the Scheduling Conference set for May 26, 2021, at 11:00 A.M. shall do so by telephone by calling the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/10/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
6 6 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/15 9:32 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/12/21 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/19/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/26/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (nmarb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1,
Att: 2 Attachment 2
5 5 order Minute Order Fri 03/12 4:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-1] is May 12, 2021. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/12/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
4 4 misc Summons Issued Mon 03/08 12:07 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jsalz, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
3 3 misc Report re: Patent/Trademark Mon 03/08 12:00 PM
Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 03/08 11:58 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/08 10:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Quokka Brew, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7751711)Attorney Michael Jacob Laszlo added to party Three Beans, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Three Beans, LLC.(Laszlo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet