Cohen et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-80503 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Nevada, 2:21-cv-00271 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 04, 2021 6:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Mai N. Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
MDL 2924 Final Judgment
Tue 09/26 3:17 PM
RULE 58 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (jmd) |
|
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
MDL Amended Complaint
Mon 09/20 12:05 PM
MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mai N. Cohen.(Brenske, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
order
Administrative Order
Tue 03/09 2:25 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 03/08 3:26 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nevada. Case Number 2:21-cv-00271 with documents 1-4. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80503-RLR on 3/8/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
6 | 6
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/08 1:21 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 03/08 1:19 PM
Case transferred in from Nevada; Case Number 2:21-cv-00271. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 Certified MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-55) transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by MDL on 3/4/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) | |
Att: 1 Text Only Minute Order | ||
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) | |
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC) | ||
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GlaxoSmithKline LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., Other Affiliate JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NA;, Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline Finance plc, Other Affiliate GSK Finance (No 2) Limited, Other Affiliate GlaxoSmithKline Holdings Limited for GlaxoSmithKline LLC added. (Fears, Chad) | |
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-21-827789-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6374472) by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Fears, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. | |
Att: 1 Index Index of Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Copies of Pleadings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Court Docket, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Pomer Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Sanofi Acquisition, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - BIPI Citizenship, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |