Evans v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-80530 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 06, 2021 6:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Lee Evans
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 02/02 2:45 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Jessica Vanden Brink representing Evans, Lee (Plaintiff) terminated ; granting5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jessica Vanden Brink representing Evans, Lee (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd) |
||
Thursday, January 27, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Substitution of Counsel Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 01/27 2:10 PM
STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Stephen "Buck" Daniel for Jessica Vanden Brink , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jessica Vanden Brink for / ( Responses due by 2/10/2022) by Lee Evans. Attorney Stephen Daniel added to party Lee Evans(pty:pla). (Daniel, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
order
Administrative Order
Thu 03/18 4:10 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 03/10 4:26 PM
MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80530-RLR with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 03/10 1:40 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/10 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., Pfizer Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem, Inc., McKesson Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14509518, filed by Lee Evans.(Vanden Brink, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Wed 03/10 4:23 PM
Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) |