DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Stevens et al
Virgin Islands District Court | |
Judge: | Wilma A Lewis |
Referred: | Emile A Henderson, III |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00013 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 06, 2021 5:05 AM AST |
Defendant
FirstBank Puerto Rico
Valdamier Collens, RA P.O. Box 309600
St.Thomas, VI 00803 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Electric Capital Corporation
CT Corporation System, RA 400 Cornerstone Drive #240
Williston, VT 05495 |
|
Defendant
SF Carnegie, LLC
1415 S. Hickory Street
Melbourne, FL 32901 |
|
Defendant
Carlvin Leonard Stevens
|
|
Defendant
Kevin Winfield Stevens
|
|
Defendant
Neal Antonio Stevens
17 Christine Circle
Bloomfield, CT 06002 |
|
Defendant
Rhea Renea Stevens
146 Estate Ruby
Christiansted, VI 00820 |
|
Defendant
Sylvin Rodford Stevens
17 Christine Circle
Bloomfield, CT 06002 |
|
Defendant
United States of America-Internal Revenue Service
U.S. Attorney's Office 1108 King Street Suite 201
Christiansted, VI 00820 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Matthew R. Reinhardt, Esq. 255 South Orange Avenue Suite 900
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
100 | 100
appeal
USCA Assigned Case Number
Mon 07/22 11:24 AM
ACK SHORT RECORD received & assigned USCA Case Number 24-2264 re99 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carlvin Leonard Stevens, Sylvin Rodford Stevens, Rhea Renea Stevens, Kevin Winfield Stevens, Neal Antonio Stevens. (TNS) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 Standing Order | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
99 | 99
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 07/10 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Carlvin Leonard Stevens, Kevin Winfield Stevens, Neal Antonio Stevens, Rhea Renea Stevens, Sylvin Rodford Stevens. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AVIDC-1150196. Appeal Record due by 7/15/2024. (Webster, Martial) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |