Wisconsin Voters Alliance, et al v. Kamala Harris, et al
Original Case: 1:20-cv-03791
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cvus-05056 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 26, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae
Matthew Xavier Etchemendy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States House of Representatives
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kamala D. Harris, Vice President, in her official capacity as President of the United States Senate
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States Senate
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
The Electoral College
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bryan Carter, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jake Corman, Senate majority Leader of Pennsylvania Senate, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gretchen Whitmer, Governor of Michigan, in her official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lee Chatfield, Speaker of the Michigan House of Representatives, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mike Shirkey, Senate Majority Leader of the Michigan Senate, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tony Evers, Governor of Wisconsin, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Robin Vos, Speaker of the Wisconsin State Assembly, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Howard Marklein, Senate Majority Leader of the Wisconsin Senate, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Brian Kemp, Governor of Georgia, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
David Ralston, Speaker of the Georgia House of Representatives, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Butch Miller, President Pro Tempore of the Georgia Senate, in his official capacity
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Doug Ducey, Governor of Arizona
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Russell Bowers, Speaker of the Arizona House of Representatives
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Rick Gray, Senate Majority Leader of the Arizona Senate, in his official capacity
|
|
Interested Party - Appellant
Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party - Appellant
Erick G. Kaardal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Leah Hoopes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Pennsylvania Voters Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jeff L. Mursau, Representative
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Georgia Voters Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Election Integrity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Arizona Voter Integrity Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Lynie Stone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Baron Benham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Debi Haas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Brenda Savage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Matthew Dadich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jeff L Mursau, Representative
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ron Heuer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Richard W. Kucksdorf
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Debbie Jacques
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
John Wood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Sonny Borrelli, Senator
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Warren Peterson, Representative
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Matthew Maddock, Representative
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Daire Rendon, Representative
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
David Steffen, Representative
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Wisconsin Voters Alliance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Brandon Beach, Senator
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
William T. Ligon, Senator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 21-5056 | ||
16 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1889263] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-03791-JEB filed by Erick G. Kaardal and Mohrman, Kaardal & Erickson, P.A.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5056 21-5056 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1889273] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 04/19/2021. APPENDIX due 04/19/2021. 21-5056 |