Fontenot v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-80547 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Western, 6:21-cv-00436 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 11, 2021 6:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline L L C
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U S Services Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Kelly G Fontenot
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
order
Administrative Order
Thu 03/18 4:10 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
9 | 9 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Western District of Louisiana. Case Number 6:21-cv-00436 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80547-RLR on 3/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) | |
8 | 8 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 03/15 9:30 AM
Case transferred in from Louisiana Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00436. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 03/15 9:33 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 03/15 10:21 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Western District of Louisiana. Case Number 6:21-cv-00436 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80547-RLR on 3/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
||
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 56, directing transfer to Southern District of Florida, In Re: Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2924. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-56) in MDL No.2924, IN RE: Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Southern District of Florida upon request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) | |
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, GlaxoSmithKline L L C, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi U S Services Inc. (crt,Jones, P) | |
3 | 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Denying 2 Motion to Serve by USM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/24/2021. (crt,Jones, P) | |
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION to Serve by USM by Kelly G Fontenot. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/23/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF AS ATTACHMENT #2 TO1 COMPLAINT.(crt,Jones, P). Added MOTION to Serve by USM on 2/24/2021 (Jones, P). | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc, GlaxoSmithKline L L C, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi U S Services Inc with Jury Demand (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Gilbert J Aucoin, Kelly G Fontenot. (Attorney Gilbert Joseph Aucoin added to party Kelly G Fontenot(pty:pet))(aty,Aucoin, Gilbert) Modified on 2/23/2021 to edit text (Jones, P). | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying fees or costs, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed order | ||
CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P) |