Jones v. Conway, Arkansas, City of et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Case #: | 4:21-cv-00205 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 12, 2021 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Conway, Arkansas, City of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brandon Huff
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jody Spradlin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jimmy Weser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tanner Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaala D Jones
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/04/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 02, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/02 10:57 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing this case with prejudice due to settlement, pursuant to28 motion; cancelling the trial scheduled for 11/07/2022; and directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 08/02/2022. (llg) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/01 10:08 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Due to Settlement by Conway, Arkansas, City of, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams (Adams, Jenna) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/11 10:55 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to20 stipulation of dismissal filed 05/06/2022, all claims against Separate Defendant Brandon Huff are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/11/2022. (llg) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 06/23 4:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin:Settlement Conference held on 6/23/2022. (ERO - Tenesha Brown) (tjb) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 06/22 11:06 AM
ORDER Re: General Order 54: Attorneys Connor Eldridge and Jenna Adams and any other counsel, staff, and clients affiliated with this case are authorized to bring cell phones, laptop computers, digital cameras or personal digital assistants into the courthouse on 6/23/2022, subject to the rules in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 6/22/2022. (jbh) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/16 12:54 PM
AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 11/7/2022 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Discovery due by 7/29/2022; Motions due by 8/31/2022; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/11/2022; Status Report due by 9/13/2022. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/16/2022. (kog) |
|
order
Order
Mon 05/16 3:32 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER Clarifying Expert Disclosures and Report Deadline in the Amended Final Scheduling Order: Rebuttal expert disclosures, including reports, must be made before July 15, 2022. The deadline for deposing all experts is August 8, 2022. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/16/2022. (kog) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 05/10 2:58 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting21 Motion for continuance and extension of all deadlines. A new scheduling order will be filed separately. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/10/2022. (sjh) |
||
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend Time
Mon 05/09 3:21 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions and/or Extend All Remaining Deadlines by Conway, Arkansas, City of, Brandon Huff, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams (Adams, Jenna) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/06 1:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Separate Defendant Brandon Huff's Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kaala D Jones. (Eldridge, William) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/03 12:01 PM
ORDER allowing the attorneys and parties to bring electronic devices including cell phones, laptop computers, and PDA type devices into the Courthouse for the settlement conference scheduled on 6/23/22 before Judge Edie R. Ervin pursuant to General Order 54. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 5/3/22. (tjb) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 05/03 11:41 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying16 Motion to Extend Trial date and deadlines at this time. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/3/2022. (sjh) |
||
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/02 2:36 PM
LETTER ORDER scheduling a settlement conference for 6/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #389 before Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 5/2/2022. (jbh) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extend Time
Fri 04/29 11:12 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time Trial Date and all Remaining Deadlines by Conway, Arkansas, City of, Brandon Huff, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams (Adams, Jenna) |
|
Tuesday, April 26, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference
Tue 04/26 2:28 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/26/2022. (ldb) |
|
Tuesday, July 27, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 07/27 4:23 PM
STIPULATED AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting12 motion for protective order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/27/2021. (llg) |
|
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/26 2:54 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 8/22/2022 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Discovery due by 5/16/2022; Motions due by 6/8/2022; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 7/25/2022; Status Report due by 6/28/2022. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/26/2021. (kog) |
|
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Protective Order
Fri 07/23 9:15 AM
MOTION for Protective Order by Conway, Arkansas, City of, Brandon Huff, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams(Adams, Jenna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Agreed Protective Order | ||
Thursday, July 01, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 07/01 11:48 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Conway, Arkansas, City of, Brandon Huff, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams. Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Adams, Jenna) |
|
Friday, June 04, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Fri 06/04 1:07 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 6/28/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/12/2021. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 8/22/2022 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/4/2021.(kog) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order | ||
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
misc
Docket Note
Tue 06/01 9:40 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Judge James M. Moody Jr. Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/1/2021. (ajt) |
||
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/19 2:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Conway, Arkansas, City of, Brandon Huff, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams.(Adams, Jenna) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/19 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Adams on behalf of Conway, Arkansas, City of, Brandon Huff, Jody Spradlin, Jimmy Weser, Tanner Williams (Adams, Jenna) |
|
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/05 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. Jody Spradlin served on 3/30/2021. (bmd) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/05 4:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. The City of Conway, Office of City Attorney served on 3/30/2021. (bmd) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/05 3:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. The City of Conway, Office of Mayor served on 3/30/2021. (bmd) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/05 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. Brandon Huff served on 3/30/2021. (bmd) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/05 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. Jimmy Weser served on 3/30/2021. (bmd) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/05 3:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaala D Jones. Tanner Williams served on 3/31/2021. (bmd) |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/23 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) |
||
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/16 9:50 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Kaala D Jones. No summons issued. (Fee of $402 paid, Receipt #LIT081275.) (ljb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |