Jane Doe v. WebGroup Czech Republic, as, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sherilyn Peace Garnett |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02428 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2021 |
Re-opened: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2025 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 14, 2021 2:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Deborah Malorie Pacaud
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Digital Ocean, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WebGroup Czech Republic, as
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WGCZ Limited, sro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WGCZ Holding, as
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VS Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Traffic F, sro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Serverstack, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephane Michael Pacaud
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NKL Associates sro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HC Multimedia LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HC Media, sro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GTFlix TV, sro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FTCP, sro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FBP Media sro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Digital Ocean Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
208 | 208
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,205 , Judgment,,207 . (Appeal Fee - $605 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39489537.)(Amini, Mona) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |