Freitag v. AmerisourceBergen Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-80583 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 18, 2021 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corp.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline PLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Duane Reade, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Freitag
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Terminate Case Associations
Wed 06/29 7:50 AM
ORDER Deconsolidating Cases. This case is DECONSOLIDATED from MDL proceeding 20-MD-2924. Case remains closed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
Tue 06/21 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Michael Freitag (Roslansky, Eric) |
|
Monday, March 29, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
order
Administrative Order
Mon 03/29 10:31 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80583-RLR with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) | |
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/23 11:09 AM
Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Chattem Inc., Duane Reade, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline PLC, McKesson Corp., Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Co..(ebz) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 6 1 pgs Summon(s), | ||
Att: 7 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 8 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 9 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 10 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 11 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 12 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 13 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 14 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 15 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 16 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 17 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 18 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 19 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 20 Summon(s) | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 03/23 2:37 PM
Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Tue 03/23 2:40 PM
MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80583-RLR with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) | |
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/22 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14541946, filed by Michael Freitag.(Bigger, Brent) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) Amerisource Bergen, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) BI International GmbH, | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Summon(s) BIC USA, | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) BIC, | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s) BIP Inc., | ||
Att: 7 Summon(s) BIP, | ||
Att: 8 Summon(s) Cardinal Health, | ||
Att: 9 Summon(s) Chattem, | ||
Att: 10 Summon(s) CVS, | ||
Att: 11 Summon(s) Duane Reade, | ||
Att: 12 Summon(s) GSK America, | ||
Att: 13 Summon(s) GSK LLC, | ||
Att: 14 Summon(s) GSK PLC, | ||
Att: 15 Summon(s) McKesson, | ||
Att: 16 Summon(s) Patheon, | ||
Att: 17 Summon(s) Pfizer, | ||
Att: 18 Summon(s) SA U.S. LLC, | ||
Att: 19 Summon(s) Sanofi S.A., | ||
Att: 20 Summon(s) Sanofi US Services, | ||
Att: 21 Summon(s) Walgreens Co., | ||
Att: 22 Summon(s) WBA | ||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 03/23 9:45 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) |