Original Case: 1:18-cv-00566

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-00636
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2021
Terminated:Sep 22, 2022
Last checked: Friday Sep 23, 2022 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Andrew Cuomo, both individually and in his official capacity
Defendant
The New York State Department of Financial Services
Defendant - Appellant
Maria T. Vullo, both individually and in her former official capacity
Represented By
Marissa Benavides
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Debra L. Greenberger
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
contact info
Andrew G. Celli Jr.
Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
National Rifle Association of America
Represented By
Sarah Brooke Rogers
Brewer, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info

GPO Sep 22 2022
OPINION, reversing the district court's denial of Vullo's motion to dismiss and remanding the case with directions for the district court to enter judgment for Vullo, by RSP, DC, SLC, FILED.[3386580] [21-636]

Docket last updated: 09/23/2022 4:29 AM EDT
Monday, March 22, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Maria T. Vullo, FILED. [3061553] [21-636] [Entered: 03/23/2021 09:21 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 42 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/15/2021, RECEIVED.[3061562] [21-636] [Entered: 03/23/2021 09:24 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Maria T. Vullo, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5465068, FILED.[3061565] [21-636] [Entered: 03/23/2021 09:25 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3061569] [21-636] [Entered: 03/23/2021 09:27 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 41 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED