Roig Cardenales et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-80594 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Puerto Rico, 3:21-cv-01103 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 20, 2021 5:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Drogueria Betances, LLC
Ave Luis Munoz Marin, Esq. Troche Final Bo. Tomas de Castro
Caguas, PR 00725 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Farmacia Baldorioty, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Farmacia Cristina LMDM LLC
|
|
Defendant
Farmacia El Tuque
|
|
Defendant
Farmacia Marilyn
|
|
Defendant
Farmacias Caribe, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis Puerto Rico Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline Puerto Rico Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 1-100
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Puerto Rico CVS Pharmacy, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health P.R. 120, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen of Puerto Rico, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerisource Corporation
CT Corporation System 1200 S Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corporacion Flores Rivera
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health P.R. 218, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health P.R. 220, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health P.R. 436, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Super Farmacia Nelia, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Miriam I Velez Ocasio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria De Los Angeles Vega Oliveras
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana Elena Roig Cardenales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lourdes Rivera Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Torres Melendez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angel Tellado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Plaza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Efrain Figueroa Baez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor D Perez Vazquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Morgado Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Luis Matos Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana Martinez Vazquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Liz Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
German Delgado Lugo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yadira Delgado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynda Colon Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yolanda Claudio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Castro Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana B Castro Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilfredo Casiano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iria Alvarado Collazo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nilda J Acosta Montalvo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 29, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
order
Administrative Order
Mon 03/29 10:31 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
17 | 17 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01103 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80594-RLR on 3/24/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) | |
16 | 16 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 03/24 10:00 AM
Case transferred in from Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:21-cv-01103. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/24 8:36 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CTO-57 received from the Southern District of Florida. (gav) |
|
Att: 1 E-mail notification from Southern District of Florida | ||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Wed 03/24 10:04 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Wed 03/24 1:30 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01103 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80594-RLR on 3/24/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) |
||
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
13 | 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-57) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL # 2924. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel John W. Nichols on 3/17/2021. (gav) | |
Att: 1 Tag along actions, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Electronic Filing | ||
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto) | |
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2021 to File Answer to the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Miguel J. Ortega-Nunez on behalf of Drogueria Betances LLC Responses due by 3/29/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ortega-Nunez, Miguel) Modified on 3/16/2021 remove italics (gav). | |
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel for Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Estrella, Alberto) Modified on 3/12/2021 remove italics (gav). | |
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 11, 2021 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Responses due by 3/24/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro Jimenez-Rodriguez on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (Jimenez-Rodriguez, Pedro) | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katarina Stipec-Rubio on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation (Stipec-Rubio, Katarina) | |
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER granting2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents; granting2 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 5, 2021 to file Certified Translation of Exhibit C to Notice of Removal . Certified Translation due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 3/9/2021. (ERC) | |
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) | |
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Carlos Velez-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Velez-Colon, Jose) | |
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until April 5, 2021 to file Certified Translation of Exhibit C to Notice of Removal filed by Mauricio O. Muniz-Luciano on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Responses due by 3/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Juan Superior Court, case number SJ2020CV04933. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0104-7210794), filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc..(Muniz-Luciano, Mauricio) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certified Translation of First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - State Court Pleadings and Orders, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Sanofi Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Amerisource Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - McKesson Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - GSK Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Cardinal Declaration, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Pfizer Declaration, | ||
Att: 10 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet |