City of Downey v. 3M Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00848 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2021 |
Case in other court: | California Central, 2:21-cv-01898 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 20, 2021 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwall, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Ratheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, L.L.C.
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Plaintiff
City of Downey
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Terminated: 04/16/2021
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Terminated: 04/16/2021
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
Terminated: 04/16/2021
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
Terminated: 04/16/2021
|
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
Terminated: 04/16/2021
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/09 7:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 05/05 2:33 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 3056 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; granting (175) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03432-RMG; granting (177) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03488-RMG; granting (10) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-02906-RMG; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-03120-RMG; granting (103) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-03434-RMG; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:20-cv-02384-RMG; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:20-cv-02812-RMG; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-00848-RMG; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-00851-RMG; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-01649-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03214-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03215-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03216-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03217-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03218-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-00179-RMG; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-00919-RMG; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-01078-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02221-RMG; granting (6) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02222-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02823-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03118-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03119-RMG; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03870-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03871-RMG; granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03875-RMG) Motion to Withdraw M. Cristina Sanchez as Attorney for plaintiffs (as listed on Attachment A). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/5/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 05/02 10:53 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney M. Cristina Sanchez by Bakman Water Company, City of Sioux Falls, City of Galesburg, City of San Jose California, City of Burbank, Town of Barnstable, City of Salisbury, Town of Webster, Randi Burke, Thomas Burke, Asha Chacko, Joshua Chacko, Melisa Cunningham, Melanie Dortch, Ryan Dortch, Frederick Hays, Jr, Suzanne Hays, Lawrence Hettinger, Edie Huber, Brian King, Julia King, Christopher Kruegler, Kimberley Murphy, Sean Murphy, Gillian Price, Federico Raffa, Town of Maysville, Town of Danvers, Sacramento County Water Agency, City of Taneytown, Town of Poolesville, Town of Ayer, City of Downey, CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY, EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY, California Water Service Company, Sandwich Water District, Town of Ayer, City of Whittier. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment A | ||
Thursday, July 01, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Report
Thu 07/01 1:58 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corp, BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/15 6:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Downey as to Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Central Sprinkler, LLC, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, Johnson Controls Fire Protection, LP, and Johnson Controls International, plc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/14 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Darren D Sumich on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Sumich, Darren) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Cossich, Christina) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A Parsiola on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Parsiola, David) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Cossich, Philip) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Smith, Luana) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(McDougal, Cary) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Summy, Scott) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Burke Pickrel, Carla) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/13 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by M Cristina Sanchez on behalf of City of Downey Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-00848-RMG(Sanchez, M) Modified on 4/13/2021 to correct party filer(sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 07, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/07 4:53 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corp. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 03/24 6:26 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: California Central, 2:21-cv-01898, City of Downey v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-848-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. CMO Nos. 1 - 15, (including 2.A, 3.A, 3.B, 3.C, 3.D, 3.E, 3.F, 4(Buckeye Project Files), 5.A, 5.B, 5.C, 5.D, 5.E, 6.A, 6.B, 6.C, 6.D, 10.A, 11.A) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed on the Court's MDL website. Please also read NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Status Conference will be a Telephone Conference set for 4/16/2021 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) |
|
15 | 15
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 03/24 6:01 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-01898. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/24 10:17 AM
Conditional Transfer Order - 47 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2873, transferring case to USDC, District of South Carolina and assigned to Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Case transferred electronically on 3/24/2021. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
13 | 13 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant 3M Company.(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Supplement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Supplement, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
12 | 12 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
11 | 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 3M Company answer now due 4/7/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery),,,, filed by Defendant 3M Company.(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
10 | 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Order9 - (Standing Order) served on 03/04/21. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
9 | 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Notice of Clerical Error (G-11),7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form5 served on 03/02/21. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-01898 PA (PDx). (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 03/01/2021. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV03250 Receipt No: ACACDC-30785979 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attorney Daniel David Queen added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Queen, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal | ||
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., AGC, Inc., Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Archroma Management, LLC, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Central Sprinkler LLC, ChemDesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, John Doe Defendants, Johnson Controls Fire Protection, LP, Johnson Controls International PLC, Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwall, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam Inc., Ratheon Technologies Corporation, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products, LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff City of Downey. (filed in state court 1/27/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] | ||
COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff City of Downey, upon Defendant 3M Company served on 1/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 2) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 3/24/2021.] |