Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:21-cv-02549
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2021
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00740
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 05, 2021 2:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
BRADSHAW ANDERSON
Represented By
Charles H. Johnson
Law Offices Of Charles H. Johnson, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Monday, August 30, 2021
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 08/30 7:37 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Bradshaw Anderson] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 08/30 7:36 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Bradshaw Anderson] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/30 7:34 AM
Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Bradshaw Anderson] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 04/08 11:34 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00740. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 04/08 11:47 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: District of Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00740, Anderson v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 21-cv-2549 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order CTO 263 cc: JPMDL (msrS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
5 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-263) transferring case to the Northern District of California per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
4 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
3 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (lmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-740 (NEB/HB). (lmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $402, receipt number AMNDC-8612195) filed by Bradshaw Anderson. Filer requests summons issued. (Johnson, Charles) Modified text on 3/19/2021 (lmb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet