Walker v. Sanofi-Aventis US LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-80713 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Nebraska, 4:21-cv-03070 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 11, 2021 7:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Target Stores, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
WalMart Stores, Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Donn H. Walker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
order
MDL Order Dismissing Party
Thu 02/03 4:54 PM
ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASES re20 Notice. This case shall remain CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/3/2022. Related Cases: 9:20-md-02924-RLR, 9:21-cv-80713-RLR See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/02 2:39 PM
NOTICE by Donn H. Walker Plaintiff's Rule 41(a)(2) Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Williams, Christian) |
|
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Wed 02/02 8:50 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re17 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 18 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas) |
||
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/01 5:33 PM
NOTICE by Donn H. Walker Plaintff's Rule 41(a)(2) Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Williams, Christian) |
|
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 02/02 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Donn H. Walker. (See DE#17 for document image). (jas) |
||
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
order
Administrative Order
Mon 04/19 2:53 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 4/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
15 | 15 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nebraska. Case Number 4:21-cv-03070 with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-80713-RLR on 4/14/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc) | |
14 | 14 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
13 | 13
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Wed 04/14 2:46 PM
Case transferred in from Nebraska; Case Number 4:21-cv-03070. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc). |
|
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
Case transferred to District of USDC-Southern District of Florida, 20md2924Rosenberg. Original electronic file sent. (JAB) | ||
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
12 | 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (JAB) | |
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
11 | 11 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (LKO) | |
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
10 | 10 Summons Issued as to defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC, Target Stores, Inc., and Walmart Stores, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) | |
Monday, March 29, 2021 | ||
9 | 9 Summons Requested as to Walmart Inc regarding Complaint,1 . (Domina, David) | |
8 | 8 Summons Requested as to Target Corporation regarding Complaint,1 . (Domina, David) | |
7 | 7 Summons Requested as to Sanofi-Aventis US LLC regarding Complaint,1 . (Domina, David) | |
6 | 6 Summons Requested as to Sanofi US Services Inc regarding Complaint,1 . (Domina, David) | |
5 | 5 Summons Requested as to Chattem, Inc regarding Complaint,1 . (Domina, David) | |
4 | 4 Summons Requested as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc regarding Complaint,1 . (Domina, David) | |
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 LETTER by Clerk regarding Complaint1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM) | |
2 | 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) | |
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis US LLC, Target Stores, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4366782), by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Donn H Walker(Domina, David) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |