City of Watertown v. 3M Company, The
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01104 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 11, 2021 6:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Watertown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/09 7:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 05/20 7:20 AM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG. The PEC and the non-settled defendants in the Telomer water district bellwether have moved jointly for a 60-day extension of the scheduling order and a delay in the commencement of the trial until January 25, 2025, to provide the parties sufficient time to devote to their mediation efforts. (Dkt. No. 5005 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (41) in case 2:21-cv-01104-RMG; (53) in case 2:22-cv-00199-RMG). For good cause shown, the motion is granted. The Court will issue an amended CMO in accordance with this Order. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/19/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Sunday, May 19, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Extension of Time
Sun 05/19 4:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Southeast Morris County Municipal Utilities Authority, The, City of Watertown. Response to Motion due by 6/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(London, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/17 8:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kathleen Borland, City of Eau Claire, City of Scottsdale, City of Coral Springs, City of Plant City, City of South Gate, City of Monroe, City of Ruston, City of Natchitoches, County Of Moore, City of Prescott, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, California Water Service Company, City of Shreveport, Connecticut Water Company, South Adams County Water and Sanitation District, City of San Jose California, City of Benwood, City of Lake Charles, City of Burbank, City of Adelanto, City of Plantation, County of San Joaquin, City of Watertown, City of Mansfield, Town of Prescott Valley, City of Loxley, Immokalee Water & Sewer District, Sacramento County, City of Fairborn, Alameda County Water District, City of Lathrop, City of Zephyrhills, City of Pompano Beach, City of Clovis, Howard County Maryland, Pasco County, City of Toledo.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope A | ||
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/13 3:32 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Staying Claims Against 3M Company by Southeast Morris County Municipal Utilities Authority, The, City of Watertown. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(London, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/30 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Barbara Dobosz on behalf of Dynax Corporation, Dynax Corporation Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(Dobosz, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Sever
Wed 04/24 11:07 AM
ORDER This Order relates to: (member cases as listed on ORDER). The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to sever the claims against KFI and the KFI-Related Entities from the referenced actions. The Court retains jurisdiction to address these severed claims in a future order. (granting 4745 Motion to Sever in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (65) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03370-RMG; (75) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03371-RMG; (70) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03372-RMG; (69) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03381-RMG; (100) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03438-RMG; (75) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03390-RMG; (63) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03401-RMG; (70) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03395-RMG; (65) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03404-RMG; (64) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03417-RMG; (63) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03385-RMG; (65) Motion to Sever in case 2:18-cv-03391-RMG; (19) Motion to Sever in case 2:20-cv-00209-RMG; (21) Motion to Sever in case 2:20-cv-00278-RMG; (21) Motion to Sever in case 2:20-cv-00257-RMG; (19) Motion to Sever in case 2:20-cv-00291-RMG; (21) Motion to Sever in case 2:20-cv-00301-RMG; (21) Motion to Sever in case 2:20-cv-00302-RMG; (21) Motion to Sever in case 2:20-cv-00428-RMG; (14) Motion to Sever in case 2:20-cv-00521-RMG; (21) Motion to Sever in case 2:21-cv-01104-RMG; (11) Motion to Sever in case 2:21-cv-03181-RMG; (35) Motion to Sever in case 2:22-cv-00199-RMG). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/24/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 04/24 10:42 AM
TEXT ORDER: This Order Relates to Case Nos. 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG. Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation, (Dkt. No. 4865 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG); (32) in case 2:21-cv-01104-RMG; (45) in case 2:22-cv-00199-RMG), and in light of the Court's final approval of the DuPont Settlement Agreement, the Court stays all claims against E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company (n/k/a EIDP, Inc.), The Chemours Company FC, LLC, The Chemours Company, Corteva Inc., and DuPont de Nemours, Inc. ("Settling Defendants") in City of Watertown v. 3M Co., et al., No. 2:21-cv-1104 and Southeast Morris County Municipal Utilities Authority v. 3M Co., et al., No. 2:22-cv-199. Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases preserve their right to assert, following expiration of the stay, any claims not barred by the Settlement, and Settling Defendants preserve all of their defenses to any such claims. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/24/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clifton L Brinson on behalf of Dynax Corporation (Brinson, Clifton) |
|
34 | 34
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Dynax Corporation.(Ries, Addie) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Addie K S Ries on behalf of Dynax Corporation (Ries, Addie) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Stay
Wed 04/17 9:54 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Cases Against E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company (n/k/a EIDP, Inc.), The Chemours Company FC, LLC, The Chemours Company, Corteva, Inc., and DuPont de Nemours, Inc. by Southeast Morris County Municipal Utilities Authority, The, City of Watertown. Response to Motion due by 5/1/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(London, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/10 9:33 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.(Condron, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
order
Case Management Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 04/09 3:36 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 27.F. This Order Relates to The Southeast Morris County Municipal Utilities Authority, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG and City of Watertown v. 3M Company et al., 2:21-cv-1104-RMG. PROTOCOL REGARDING FILING RULE 12(b)(1), (b)(2) AND/OR 12(b)(5) DEFENSES IN TELOMER WATER PROVIDER TIER TWO CASES Please See Order for further Details. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. (Motions granted: ( 4788 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 36 in 2:22-cv-00199-RMG, 23 in 2:21-cv-01104-RMG) Joint MOTION Entry of Case Management Order 27F filed by Defendants). Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/9/2024. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E Raynal, IV on behalf of Archroma US Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(Raynal, Charles) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E Raynal, IV on behalf of Clariant Corporation Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(Raynal, Charles) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/08 2:37 PM
Archroma U.S., Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint by Archroma US Inc.(Raynal, Charles) |
|
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/08 1:51 PM
Clariant Corporation's ANSWER to1 Complaint by Clariant Corporation.(Weber, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/02 5:36 PM
Joint MOTION Entry of Case Management Order 27F by Defendants. Response to Motion due by 4/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - CMO 27F | ||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion Do not use if support or object to motion
Fri 03/29 6:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re (4745 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 21 in 2:21-cv-01104-RMG) MOTION to Sever Kidde Fenwal, Inc. ("KFI") and KFI-Related Entities Response filed by Chubb Fire LTD, Chubb Fire, Ltd..Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/5/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Cassetta, Richard) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: Please note correct filing procedures for future filings . Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to applicable member case as stated on document ("Chubb Fire Limited is a defendant in the City of Watertown case (Case No. 2:21-cv-01104-RMG)" , per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. (sshe, ) Modified to original document number (in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) on 3/29/2024 (sshe, ). |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Sever
Thu 03/28 3:02 PM
MOTION to Sever Kidde Fenwal, Inc. ("KFI") and KFI-Related Entities by Plaintiffs. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 03/25 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Watertown Without Prejudice as to Archroma Management, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Case Management Order
Tue 03/19 3:29 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 22.A. This Order Relates to The Southeast Morris County Municipal Utilities Authority 2:22-cv-00199-RMG and City of Watertown v. 3M Company et al., 2:21-cv-1104-RMG. PROTOCOL REGARDING EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITIONS AND WITNESSES NOT PREVIOUSLY DEPOSED Please see Order for All Details and Deadlines regarding I. EXPERT WITNESS DISCOVERY and II. WITNESSES NOT PREVIOUSLY DEPOSED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/19/2024. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Discovery
Tue 03/12 7:14 PM
Joint MOTION for Discovery Entry of Case Management Order 22-A by Defendants. Response to Motion due by 3/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed CMO 22-A | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/06 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C Condron on behalf of AGC Chemicals Americas Inc (Condron, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/05 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Goldsticker on behalf of Archroma US Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(Goldsticker, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/05 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Alan Goldsticker on behalf of Clariant Corporation Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG(Goldsticker, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/01 9:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP.(Dukes, David) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/29 2:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by BASF Corporation.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/06 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Pahl on behalf of Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP (Pahl, Jessica) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG, 2:22-cv-00199-RMG QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel: Please note correct filing procedures for future filings . Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case and spread to applicable member case(s) as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/15 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lara Say on behalf of City of Watertown Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG(Say, Lara) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/10 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca G Newman on behalf of City of Watertown Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG(Newman, Rebecca) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/10 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gary J Douglas on behalf of City of Watertown Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01104-RMG(Douglas, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/28 12:19 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corp, BASF Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 04/15 10:41 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), City of Watertown v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-1104-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: South Dakota (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/15 10:39 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/15 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9775722.), filed by City of Watertown. Service due by 7/13/2021(sshe, ) |