Natour et al v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Amos L Mazzant, III |
Case #: | 4:21-cv-00331 |
Nature of Suit | 430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 23, 2021 4:11 AM CDT |
Defendant
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Fidelity National Law Group 5151 Belt Line Road Suite 410
Dallas, TX 75254 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Bickell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Data Payment Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
One Payment Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Paide
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ali Hicham Hamdan
9432 Ramona St.
Bellflower, CA 90706 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enclare, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nick Natour
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Elavon, Inc.
Terminated: 06/23/2021
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Luis A. Requejo
Terminated: 10/01/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/10 12:54 PM
USCA 5th CIRCUIT NOTICE: Supplemental eROA has been accepted. 24-40484 (rpc) |
||
appeal
USCA Availability of eROA
Tue 09/10 12:55 PM
Appeal Remark re: Counsel can access the record on appeal by following the instructions in the link. If an appearance wasn't made in the appellant court, counsel doesn't have access through the link.[LINK:Link to Instructions] re266 Notice of Appeal : (rpc) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
275 | 275
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/05 8:30 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jocelyne Macelloni on behalf of Data Payment Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10338241. (Macelloni, Jocelyne) |