Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:21-cv-00165
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2021
Terminated:Nov 18, 2022
Case in other court:DeKalb Superior Court, 17D01-2104-CT-000018
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 27, 2021 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Adventure Homes, LLC
Represented By
Shane C Mulholland
Burt Blee Dixon Sutton & Bloom LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shelly Sanders, IN 46802
Represented By
Ilene M Smith
Christopher C Myers & Associates
contact info
Christopher C Myers
Christopher C Myers & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, November 18, 2022
33 33 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Fri 11/18 3:29 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendant Adventure Homes, LLC. (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
utility Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1 Fri 11/18 4:55 PM
CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re33 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. (lf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
31 31 adr Report of Mediation Wed 11/02 1:19 PM
REPORT of Mediation by Anthony Stites.(Stites, Anthony)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/02 2:11 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Based on the filing of the31 Report of Mediator advising of settlement, parties are ordered to file dismissal papers by 12/5/2022. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 10/17 1:34 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The29 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer and Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery is granted. Dft granted to and including 10/24/2022 to answer and respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Admissions. Text entry order. (mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/13 3:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer and Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery by Defendant Adventure Homes, LLC. (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/22 9:58 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The27 Motion for Modification of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines is granted. Discovery deadline is 1/25/2023. Dispositive motions to be filed by 2/24/2023. Text entry order. (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/21 1:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Motion for Modification of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Defendant Adventure Homes, LLC. (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 22, 2022
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/22 1:53 PM
ANSWER to25 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Adventure Homes, LLC.(Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/02 8:33 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adventure Homes, LLC, filed by Shelly Sanders.(Myers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A through D, EEOC Charges and NORTS
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 03/01 4:03 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is afforded to and including 03/08/2022 to file the amended complaint (ECF 23-1) and exhibits (ECF 23-2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 03/01/2022. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
23 23 motion Amend/Correct Wed 02/09 12:55 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct3 State Court Complaint by Plaintiff Shelly Sanders.(Myers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-D
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
22 22 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/02 12:59 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 02/09/2022. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 11/2/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 03/11/2022; and from Defendant by 05/11/2022. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 02/22/2022; as to Defendant is 03/14/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 12/02/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 02/2/2022. (jdb)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 02/02 12:13 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Ilene Smith. Dft appeared by atty Shane Mulholland. Atty Smith advises the right to sue has been issued and anticipates filing an Amended Complaint within 7 days. Court lifts stays on discovery. The20 Amended Report of Parties' Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as mediator. Atty Mulholland to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Smith. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/23/2022.) (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
20 20 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Tue 01/25 1:47 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 01/13 9:41 AM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/13/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Shane Mulholland. Atty Myers advises he is following up with the EEOC as to the issuance of a notice of right to sue re Pla's second charge. Pla will be filing an Amended Complaint once right to sue notice is issued. Stay on discovery remains. Court sets telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 2/2/22022 at 11:30 am. Court to initiate call. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 01/07 2:59 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court on its own motion VACATES the Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 11:00 am and RESETS it for 1/13/2022 at 9:30 am. Court to initiate call. Conference to be converted to Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference and parties to file an amended discovery plan, if needed. (mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
17 17 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/04 10:24 AM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/4/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Ilene Smith. Dft appeared by atty Shane Mulholland. Atty Smith anticipates EEOC to issue a notice of right to sue re second charge within next couple of weeks. At request of parties, Court continues stay on discovery for an additional 45 days. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 11:00 am. Court to initiate call. Conference to be converted to Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference and parties to file an amended discovery plan, if needed. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
16 16 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 10/22 9:12 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The15 Motion to Reschedule Telephonic Status Conference is granted. The telephonic Status Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 11/4/2021 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
15 15 motion Continue Thu 10/21 3:44 PM
MOTION to Continue - Motion to Reschedule Telephonic Status Conference by Defendant Adventure Homes, LLC. (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 10/21 8:42 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Court on its own motion VACATES the telephonic Status Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 10:00 am and RESETS it for 11/1/2021 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 10/20 4:04 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Holly A Brady for all further proceedings. Judge William C Lee no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/20/2021. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
12 12 minutes Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 05/27 2:58 PM
HEARING (scheduled as a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference) held on 5/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared telephonically with atty Ilene Smith. Atty Shane Mulholland and Susan Kasinger-Controller appeared on behalf of Dft. Atty Smith advises Pla filed a second charge with the EEOC and anticipates filing an amended complaint. Dft requests discovery be stayed pending outcome of second charge. Dft's unopposed request granted. Discovery stayed. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Status Conference to be converted to Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference and parties to file an amended discovery plan, if needed. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/27 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ilene M Smith on behalf of Shelly Sanders (Smith, Ilene)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate Tue 05/18 8:07 AM
CERTIFICATE - Attorney Certification and Client Certification . (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 05/17 3:00 PM
AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mulholland, Shane) Modified on 5/17/2021 to show amended report (lhc)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 05/17 8:24 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/17 8:11 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adventure Homes, LLC. (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
6 6 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Fri 05/07 12:01 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Fri 05/07 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/07 11:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Adventure Homes, LLC.(Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 05/03 8:51 AM
Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/30 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shane C Mulholland on behalf of Adventure Homes, LLC (Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 04/30 2:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Petition for Removal (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4560139.) from DeKalb Superior Court, Cause No. 17D01-2104-CT-000018, filed by Adventure Homes, LLC.(Mulholland, Shane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Summonses,
Att: 3 Errata C - State Court Appearance by Plaintiff's Counsel,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
3 3 cmp State Court Complaint Mon 05/03 9:00 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Adventure Homes, LLC filed in DeKalb Superior Court by Shelly Sanders. (nal)
Related: [-]