Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Marcia G Cooke
Referred: John J O'Sullivan
Case #: 1:21-cv-21679
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause22:6082 Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity Act of 1996
Case Filed:May 02, 2021
Terminated:Jun 03, 2021
Last checked: Friday Oct 29, 2021 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
ASR Group International, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Peter Klock, Jr.
Rasco Klock Perez Nieto
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Evan Stroman
Kozyak Tropin And Throckmorton
contact info
Javier Asis Lopez
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton PA
contact info
Jorge Luis Piedra
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, June 03, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 06/03 3:13 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 6/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
8 8 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Thu 05/27 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Francisco Industries, Inc. (Lopez, Javier)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/27 7:09 AM
Reset Deadlines All Defendants answer due 6/23/2021. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 05/26 1:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Defendant shall file their response by June 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/26/2021. (cpo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 05/21 2:36 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996,, by ASR Group International, Inc.. Attorney Joseph Peter Klock, Jr added to party ASR Group International, Inc.(pty:dft).(Klock, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 05/11 11:46 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Francisco Industries, Inc.. ASR Group International, Inc. served 05/04/2021, answer due 05/25/2021(Stroman, Evan) Modified Text on 5/11/2021 (cds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
4 4 11 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 05/06 3:27 PM
UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 05/03 11:20 AM
Summons Issued as to ASR Group International, Inc.. (cds)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 02, 2021
2 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
Related: [-]
1 1 Complaint re Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996 against Francisco Industries, Inc.. Filing fees $ 7202.00. This amount includes the filing fee of $ 402.00 for Opening a Civil Action and $ 6,800.00 for this Action. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14653094, payment transferred from : 21cv14188 filed by Francisco Industries, Inc..(Lopez, Javier)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summon(s) Summons