Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:21-cv-00651
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2021
Terminated:Oct 06, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 09, 2021 3:23 AM CST
Defendant
Isabella Casillas Guzman
Represented By
Christopher D Dodge
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Small Business Administration
US Small Business Administration 409 Third Street SW 6th Floor
Washington, DC 20416
Represented By
Christopher D Dodge
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Philip Greer
Represented By
Robert Earl Henneke
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Charles W Fillmore
The Fillmore Law Firm LLP
contact info
H Dustin Fillmore, III
The Fillmore Law Firm LLP
contact info
Jonathan F Mitchell
contact info
Gene Patrick Hamilton
America First Legal Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
Greer's Ranch Cafe
Represented By
Robert Earl Henneke
Texas Public Policy Foundation
contact info
Charles W Fillmore
The Fillmore Law Firm LLP
contact info
H Dustin Fillmore, III
The Fillmore Law Firm LLP
contact info
Jonathan F Mitchell
contact info
Gene Patrick Hamilton
America First Legal Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 10/06 10:51 AM
Civil Case Terminated per DJ LC and Notice of Dismissal. (mmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
12 12 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/19 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Philip Greer, Greer's Ranch Cafe (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
11 11 18 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Tue 05/18 8:58 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for TRO (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/18/2021) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Appendix in Support Tue 05/18 1:50 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Isabella Casillas Guzman, United States Small Business Administration re9 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Dodge, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Response/Objection Tue 05/18 1:49 PM
RESPONSE filed by Isabella Casillas Guzman, United States Small Business Administration re:5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Dodge, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/17 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher D Dodge on behalf of Isabella Casillas Guzman, United States Small Business Administration. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dodge, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 16, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order Sun 05/16 7:08 PM
ORDER: See Order for details. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/16/2021) (chmb)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Sun 05/16 3:42 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Philip Greer, Greer's Ranch Cafe re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Declaration(s),
Att: 4 Declaration(s),
Att: 5 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Temporary Restraining Order Sun 05/16 3:38 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Philip Greer, Greer's Ranch Cafe (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/13 1:34 PM
Summons issued as to Isabella Casillas Guzman, United States Small Business Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sre)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Thu 05/13 1:31 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 05/13 12:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philip Greer, Greers Ranch Caf. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/13 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Isabella Casillas Guzman, United States Small Business Administration filed by Greers Ranch Caf, Philip Greer. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11890835) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 242 pgs Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s),
Att: 3 Cover Sheet